Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. KB Home, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Defendant: KB Home, KB Home Raleigh-Durham, Inc. and Stock Building Supply, LLC
Case Number: 5:2013cv00831
Filed: December 4, 2013
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 22, 2016 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 157 order of the magistrate judge granting KB Defendants motion to stay, denying 144 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, denying 150 Motion to Seal Document 149 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit and denying 161 Motion to Strike. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/22/2016. (Marsh, K)
May 3, 2016 157 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 134 Motion to Stay and denying 142 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/3/2016. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Marsh, K)
August 14, 2015 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 80 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - KB's motion for partial judgment on the pleadings, is GRANTED as to the breach of contract claim. KB's request for attorneys' fees in connection with the breach of contract claim is DENIED. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 08/14/2015. (Baker, C.)
July 21, 2015 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 85 Motion For Clarification, denying 89 Motion to Compel and denying 99 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/21/2015. (Marsh, K)
June 9, 2015 109 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 6/9/2015. (Marsh, K)
May 4, 2015 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 64 Motion to Quash, granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel, granting 70 Motion to Intervene and dismissing as moot 77 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/4/2015. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical information and deadlines. (Marsh, K)
April 2, 2015 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion for Leave to Appear (Limited Appearance of Catherine Biggs Arrowood). Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 4/2/2015. (Marsh, K)
October 28, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings and denying 39 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 10/28/2014. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company v. KB Home, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Fire Insurance Company
Represented By: J. Mark Langdon
Represented By: William Walton Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Home
Represented By: Michael W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KB Home Raleigh-Durham, Inc.
Represented By: Michael W. Knapp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stock Building Supply, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?