Ramsey v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, Inc.

Plaintiff: Richard Ramsey
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00026
Filed: January 21, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: HARNETT
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, denying 14 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and denying as moot 16 Motion for Hearing. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/10/2014. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Marsh, K)
March 24, 2015 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 34 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 3/24/2015. (Marsh, K)
May 20, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 47 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 5/20/2015. (Marsh, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramsey v. Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ramsey
Represented By: Edgar R. Bain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bimbo Foods Bakeries Distribution, Inc.
Represented By: Melanie Black Dubis
Represented By: Deborah L. Edney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.