Gibson v. Corning Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Daryl K. Gibson
Defendant: Corning Inc., Mario Scarletto, Bill Kerns, Keith Howel, Jim Enos, Cadena McPearson and Annia M. Allgretto
Case Number: 5:2014cv00105
Filed: February 28, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 14, 2015 55 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment [DE 34] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment [DE 26] and all remaining motions [DE 37, 38, 39, 40, 44, 45] are DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that as the Court granted defendants' motion for summary judgment in its entirety, plaintiff's remaining motions [DE 48, 49, 50, 52] are DENIED AS MOOT. This case is closed. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 4/14/2015. Copy of judgment to plaintiff via US Mail at 944 Bonham Avenue, Apartment 2, Wilmington, NC 28403. (Marsh, K)
April 13, 2015 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 26 Motion for Summary Judgment, granting 34 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying as moot 37 Motion TO IMPEACH AND SUPPRESS KEITH HOWEL'S STATEMENT BASED ON FIFTH AMENDMENT VIOLATIONS, 38 Motion FOR ENTRY OF F INAL JUDGMENT, 39 Motion FOR "MULTIPLEM" JUDGMENTS / MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON ALL OR PARTIAL CLAIMS, 40 Motion FOR GLOBAL SETTLEMENT REQUEST FOR COMPENSATIONAL AND PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 44 Motion for Admisabality and Brief and Notification of New Address, and 45 Motion for Sipositive Motions Judgement. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/8/2015. Copy of order mailed to plaintiff via US Mail at 944 Bonham Avenue, Apartment 2, Wilmington, NC 28403. (Marsh, K)
October 29, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 21 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and DENYING 22 Plaintiff's Motion for Admissibility. The subpoenas at 19 and [21-2] are hereby STRUCK. The Clerk is directed to issue a summons to Larry Sutton as a defendant in this c ase at the address listed at [21-1]. The amendments to the complaint at 18 and 20 are allowed and are added as amendments to the complaint as if they were a part of the original complaint. The parties are reminded that they are to comply with t his Court's orders, including the 17 Scheduling Order, and all of the applicable Local Rules and Federal Rules. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/27/2014. COpy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff, via US Mail, to 6319 Raeford Road, #23, Fayetteville, NC, 28304. (Fisher, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gibson v. Corning Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daryl K. Gibson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corning Inc.
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Scarletto
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bill Kerns
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Howel
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Enos
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cadena McPearson
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annia M. Allgretto
Represented By: Terry A. Clark
Represented By: Robin E. Shea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?