RLM Communications, Inc. v. Tuschen, et al

Plaintiff: RLM Communications, Inc.
Defendant: Amy E. Tuschen and Escience and Technology Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00250
Filed: April 25, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2015 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion for Bill of Costs - Within 14 days of this order, defendants may supplement their request with adequate documentation for the copy costs disallowed in the attached order. Failure to respond constitutes a waiver of those costs. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 04/28/2015. (Baker, C.)
March 19, 2015 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 104 Motion for Attorney Fees - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 03/19/2015. (Baker, C.)
November 25, 2014 108 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered November 7, 2014, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, that defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted; plaintiff' s motion for permanent injunction is denied and the court orders plaintiff to pay defendants' reasonable costs in the amount of $3,068.50, pursuant to Federal Rule of Procedure 37(a)(5). Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 11/25/2014. (Baker, C.)
August 12, 2014 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 67 Motion to Seal and 82 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits; granting 70 Motion for Leave to File Index of Exhibits and Related Exhibits to Plaintiff's Opening Brief; and denying as moot 94 Motion for Leave to File Under Seal - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 08/12/2014. (Baker, C.)
July 25, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Consent MOTION to Extend Mediation Deadline - The Court hereby extends the deadline for the parties to complete mediation up to and including August 11, 2014. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/25/2014. (Baker, C.)
June 16, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 06/16/2014. (Baker, C.)
May 14, 2014 27 Opinion or Order of the Court PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 05/14/2014. (Baker, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: RLM Communications, Inc. v. Tuschen, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RLM Communications, Inc.
Represented By: Coy E. Brewer, Jr.
Represented By: Jose A. Coker
Represented By: Dharmi B. Tailor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy E. Tuschen
Represented By: Michael C. Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escience and Technology Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Michael C. Lord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?