Carpenter v. Seagroves et al

Plaintiff: Tramilla Carpenter
Defendant: David Seagroves, Officer Snyder and City of Wilson Police Department
Case Number: 5:2014cv00352
Filed: June 30, 2014
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WILSON
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2016 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 6/13/2016. Copy mailed to Tramilla Carpenter, 1000 Briggs St., Wilson, NC 27893 via US Mail on 6/13/2016. (Grady, B.)
October 13, 2015 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 32 Seagroves's Motion to Dismiss and granting 34 City of Wilson's Motion to Dismiss. The City of Wilson is DISMISSED as a party to this action. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to continue management of this case. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 10/13/2015. Copy sent to Tramilla Carpenter, 1000 Briggs St., Wilson, NC 27893 via US Mail on 10/13/2015. (Grady, B.)
February 2, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 12 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for detailed information. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 2/2/2015. Certified copy sent via US Mail to Tramilla Carpenter at 1000 Briggs St., Wilson, NC 27893. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Seagroves et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tramilla Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Seagroves
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Carraway
Represented By: James P. Cauley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Snyder
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Carraway
Represented By: James P. Cauley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Wilson Police Department
Represented By: Timothy Patrick Carraway
Represented By: James P. Cauley, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?