Yelverton v. Yelverton Farms, Ltd., et al
Plaintiff: |
Stephen Thomas Yelverton |
Defendant: |
Yelverton Farms, Ltd. and Phyllis Y. Edmundson |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00365 |
Filed: |
June 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
WAYNE |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Personal Injury |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
February 26, 2015 |
Filing
74
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered February 25, 2015, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, plaintiff's motions to amend and for a determination of stock ownership are denied. The court grants defendants' motion to dismiss, and all of plaintiff's claims are dismissed for failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted. Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is dismissed as moot. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 2/26/2015. (Tripp, S.)
|
January 8, 2015 |
Filing
69
ORDER denying 68 Reconsideration regarding 11/25/2014 TEXT ORDER and for Defendants to Answer Affidavit of Wade H. Atkinson, Jr. - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 01/08/2015. (Baker, C.)
|
November 18, 2014 |
Filing
64
ORDER denying 27 Motion to Disqualify Whte & Allen, P.A. as Counsel; denying 39 Motion for Hearing; and denying 44 MOTION to Schedule the Resolution of the Motion to Disqualify Counsel Prior to the Motion to Dismiss Per Rule 12(b)(6) - Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 11/17/2014. (Baker, C.)
|
July 10, 2014 |
Filing
12
ORDER denying 6 MOTION to Recuse District Court Judge and 11 MOTION to Disqualify White & Allen, P.A. as Counsel and dismissing as moot Requests for Oral Hearing Before Resident Judge in the Western Division - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 07/10/2014. (Baker, C.)
|
July 9, 2014 |
Filing
7
ORDER denying 4 MOTION for Reconsideration regarding 3 Order Reassigning Case and denying as moot 5 MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of 4 MOTION for Reconsideration - Signed by Julie A. Richards, Clerk of Court on 07/09/2014. (Baker, C.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?