Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Policy Nos. TCNR001338, TCNR005665 and TCNR012269 v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: |
Certain Underwriters at Lloyds, London subscribing to Policy Nos. TCNR001338, TCNR005665 and TCNR012269 |
Defendant: |
Carlos O Garcia, CNNC, Stock Building Supply, LLC and New Bern Riverfront Development, LLC |
Case Number: |
5:2014cv00367 |
Filed: |
June 24, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
WAKE |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Dever |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 14, 2022 |
Filing
162
ORDER - Stock's motion for partial summary judgment [DE 147] is GRANTED. Underwriters' amended motion for limited discovery [DE 155] is GRANTED and discovery on the issue of the amount of fees and costs paid by Stock in its defense in the Underlying Action shall remain open for twenty-one days from the date of entry of this order. Woomer's motion for summary judgment [DE 122] shall remain HELD IN ABEYANCE. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/13/2022. (Stouch, L.)
|
August 24, 2021 |
Filing
141
ORDER holding in abeyance 122 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 124 Motion for Summary Judgment. Woomer's motion for summary judgment [DE 122] is HELD IN ABEYANCE for a period of fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this order. During that time, Stock shall clearly state its position on whether Woomer is entitled to summary judgment in its favor in light of the Court's decision on Underwriters' duty to defend, or otherwise resolve its third-party claims against Woomer. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/24/2021. (Sellers, N.)
|
June 21, 2018 |
Filing
107
ORDER granting 106 Motion to Withdraw without prejudice as to 92 Motion to Bifurcate and 94 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/21/2018. (Lee, L.) (Lee, L.)
|
December 4, 2017 |
Filing
58
ORDER granting 47 Motion to Lift the Stay: The court finds the reasons for the stay no longer exist, and therefore the STAY IS HEREBY LIFTED. The clerk is directed to refer this matter to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. to h old a status conference in this matter, to enter a scheduling order, and to enter such other pretrial orders as deemed necessary for the efficient administration of this matter. Signed by Senior Judge Malcolm J. Howard on 12/4/2017. Copy to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Lee, L.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?