EICES Research, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Plaintiff: EICES Research, Inc.
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2014cv00489
Filed: August 29, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER GRANTING: 73 Motion to Seal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to seal [D.E. 73] is ALLOWED. The Clerk shall retain the filing at Docket Entry 71 under permanent seal. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 6/11/2015. (O'Brien, C.)
June 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING: 51 Motion to Seal. IT IS ORDERED that the motion to seal [D.E. 51] is ALLOWED. The Clerk shall retain the filings at Docket Entries 47 , 48 , and 50 under permanent seal. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 6/9/15. (O'Brien, C.)
February 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER GRANTING: 42 Motion to Amend Caption to Reflect Name Change of Plaintiff. The clerk is directed to modify the caption to read as follows: Odyssey Wireless, Inc., Plaintiff v. Apple Inc., Defendant.Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/6/15. (O'Brien, C.)
December 1, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER denying 11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/1/14. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. (O'Brien, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EICES Research, Inc. v. Apple, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EICES Research, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin L. Burgess
Represented By: John B Campbell
Represented By: E. Bradley Evans
Represented By: Richard A. Kamprath
Represented By: Lindsay M. Leavitt
Represented By: Caroline Batchelor McLean
Represented By: Gary J. Rickner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple, Inc.
Represented By: D. J. O'Brien, III
Represented By: Clinton R. Pinyan
Represented By: Craig Daniel Schauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?