Secretary of Veterans Affairs v. Moore et al
Plaintiff: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Defendant: John A. Moore, Stacy A. Moore, Patricia B. Bissette and FM Lending Services, LLC
Thirdparty_plaintiff: John A. Moore and Stacy A. Moore
Thirdparty_defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. and Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Cross_claimant: Patricia B. Bissette and FM Lending Services, LLC
Cross_defendant: John A. Moore and Stacy A. Moore
Case Number: 5:2014cv00560
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: All Other Real Property
Cause of Action: 28:1452
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER dismissing without prejudice 6 Motion to Remand and 15 Motion for Referral. The parties have reached a contingent agreement to settle all matters in this case. Therefore, the motions are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to refile should the settlement not be consummated on or before October 9, 2015. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 8/10/2015. (Grady, B.)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay 27 Court Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall have up to and including October 9, 2015, to file the appropriate documents to dismiss this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/7/2015. (Grady, B.)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting 24 Motion to attend the Mediated Settlement Conference via Telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 6/1/2015. (Grady, B.)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 21 Motion To Be Excused From Attendance at Mediated Settlement Conference so long as they are represented at thesettlement conference by counsel of record and a representative of their insurance carrier with authority to negotiate for a settlement of Plaintiff's claim against such Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 5/14/2015. (Grady, B.)
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 17 Motion for Court Hosted Settlement Conference and 18 Motion to Stay. It is ORDERED that United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr., is hereby APPOINTED settlement master. The parties are DIRECTED to consult with Mag istrate Judge Jones and schedule a settlement conference to occur on or before July 17, 2015. Proceedings in this matter are STAYED until July 20, 2015, or until the parties otherwise notify the court of a resolution in the matter. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 4/21/2015. (Grady, B.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Secretary of Veterans Affairs v. Moore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Secretary of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Matthew Lee Fesak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stacy A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patricia B. Bissette
Represented By: Joel M. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FM Lending Services, LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: John A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Stacy A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory David Spink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Thirdparty_defendant: Residential Credit Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: John T. Benjamin, Jr.
Represented By: James R. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Patricia B. Bissette
Represented By: Joel M. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: FM Lending Services, LLC
Represented By: Joel M. Craig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: John A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Stacy A. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?