Aristilde et al v. Todd Glover Farms, Inc. et al

Petitioner: Kethlie Aristilde, Aviles Derilus and Mirtha Derilus
Respondent: Todd Glover Farms, Inc., John Doe and Pedro Martinez
Case Number: 5:2014cv00566
Filed: October 2, 2014
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 77 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Aviles Derilus, Kethlie Aristilde against John Doe, Pedro Martinez. Plaintiff Kethlie Aristilde SHALL recover from defendants John Doe and Pedro Martinez, jointly and severally, the sum of $225,000. Plaintiff Kethli e Aristilde also shall recover pre-judgment interest at the legal rate. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the legal rate until this judgment is paid in full by either or both defendants. Plaintiff Aviles Derilus SHALL recover from defendants Joh n Doe and Pedro Martinez, jointly and severally, the sum of $200,000. Plaintiff Aviles Derilus also shall recover pre-judgment interest at the legal rate. Post-judgment interest shall accrue at the legal rate until this judgment is paid in full by either or both defendants. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/12/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
July 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting 53 Motion for Entry of Default against John Doe. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/13/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
May 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting 41 Motion for Entry of Default against Pedro Martinez. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 5/10/2016. (Briggeman, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aristilde et al v. Todd Glover Farms, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kethlie Aristilde
Represented By: Lee Friedland
Represented By: Ronald T. Lawrence, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aviles Derilus
Represented By: Lee Friedland
Represented By: Ronald T. Lawrence, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mirtha Derilus
Represented By: Lee Friedland
Represented By: Ronald T. Lawrence, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Todd Glover Farms, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Pedro Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?