Laschkewitsch v. American National Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: John Laschkewitsch
Defendant: American National Life Insurance Company
Counter_claimant: American National Life Insurance Company
Counter_defendant: John Laschkewitsch
Case Number: 5:2015cv00021
Filed: January 14, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 88 Motion to Strike; denying 90 Motion to Strike ; granting 96 Motion for Extension of Time to File an appeal. Plaintiff's deadline to file an appeal is hereby extended to July 29, 2019. No further extensions will be granted. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/27/2019. (Sellers, N.)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER denying 79 Motion for Relief from Final Judgment Under Rule 60(a) and New 60(b)(1) Renewed. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/2/2019. Sent to John Laschkewitsch at 1933 Ashridge Dr. Fayetteville, NC 28304 via US Mail. (Sellers, N.)
October 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying 57 Motion for Relief from Judgment for Oversight, Omissions and Want of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; granting 61 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/11/2017. Sent to John Laschkewitsch at 1933 Ashridge Drive Fayetteville, NC 28304 via US Mail. (Briggeman, N.)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendant's motion for summary judgment based on collateral estoppel [D.E. 25], GRANTS defendant's motion to seal [D.E. 27], GRANTS plaintiffs motion to seal [D.E. 32], DE NIES plaintiffs motion for summary judgment [D.E. 34] and DENIES plaintiffs motion in limine [D.E. 38]. The court DISMISSES with prejudice plaintiffs claims and GRANTS summary judgment to defendant on its four claims.IT IS FURTHERED ORDERED that afte r applying the paralegal rate to clerical/secretarial work and deducting the amount of fees reasonably attributable to ANICO's counterclaim for breach of contract, the court AWARDS ANIC0 $115,861.41 in attorneys' fees. The court AWARDS ANICO $3,345.72 indamages, treble the amount of ANICO's compensatory damages of $1,115.24. ANICO may apply for costs consistent with the Federal Ru1es of Civil Procedure and this court's local ru1es. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/27/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendant's motion for summary judgment based on collateral estoppel [D.E. 25], GRANTS defendant's motion to seal [D.E. 27], GRANTS plaintiffs motion to seal [D.E. 32], DE NIES plaintiffs motion for summary judgment [D.E. 34] and DENIES plaintiffs motion in limine [D.E. 38]. The court DISMISSES with prejudice plaintiffs claims and GRANTS summary judgment to defendant on its four claims. Not later than August 31, 2016, defendant American National Life shall submit aproposed schedule for further proceedings concerning an award of damages, attorney's fees, and costs.. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 8/5/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
June 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DENYING: 19 Motion for Sanctions. In sum, plaintiff's motion for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/26/2015. A certified copy of this Order was sent via US Mail on 6/26/2015 to pro se plaintiff John Laschkewitsch, 1933 Ashridge Dr., Fayetteville, NC 28304. (O'Brien, C.)
April 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DENYING 10 Motion to Strike and DENYING 12 Motion to Stay. The motions [D.E. 10, 12] lack merit and are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/16/2015. A certified copy of this order was sent on 4/17/2015 via US Mail to pro se plaintiff John Laschkewitsch, 1933 Ashridge Dr., Fayetteville, NC 28304. (O'Brien, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Laschkewitsch v. American National Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Laschkewitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly C. Hanley
Represented By: Gilbert C. Laite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: American National Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly C. Hanley
Represented By: Gilbert C. Laite, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: John Laschkewitsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?