Brown v. Winman et al
Plaintiff: |
Donald Brown |
Defendant: |
George E. Winman, III and S. Darlene Winman |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv00059 |
Filed: |
February 9, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
xxU.S. Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
Terrence W. Boyle |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 10, 2017 |
Filing
88
ORDER granting 83 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/9/2017. Certified copy sent via US Mail to pro se plaintiff to 505 W 150th St., Apt. #1, New York, NY 10031. (Stouch, L.)
|
March 9, 2017 |
Filing
80
ORDER granting 59 Motion for Summary Judgment and denying 77 Motion to Strike. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/8/2017. Certified copy sent via US Mail to pro se plaintiff to 505 W 150th St., Apt. #1, New York, NY 10031. (Stouch, L.)
|
December 16, 2016 |
Filing
72
ORDER denying 48 Motion to Amend; denying as moot 49 Motion to Strike; denying 56 Motion to Compel; denying 69 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file his response to defendants motion for summary judgment within twenty-one (21) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/15/2016. Certified copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to Donald Brown 505 W 150th St., Apt. #1, New York, NY 10031. (Stouch, L.)
|
March 7, 2016 |
Filing
46
ORDER denying as to defendant's third defense and denying as MOOT defendant's fifth defense regarding 32 Motion to Strike and granting 39 Motion to Amend. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/4/2016. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to 505 W 150th St. Apt. #1, New York, NY 10031. (Romine, L.)
|
October 6, 2015 |
Filing
28
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Leave to Withdraw Claims Under Title 18 U.S.C. § 1111 and for Leave to File and Serve Amended Complaint under Rule 15(a)(2) and denying 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/6/2015. Copy of order sent to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to Donald Brown 505 W 150th St., Apt. #1, New York, NY 10031. (Romine, L.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?