Leonard et al v. Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc.
Plaintiff: |
William Leonard and Karen Leonard |
Defendant: |
Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. |
Thirdparty_defendant: |
Napa Home & Garden, Inc., Fuel Barons, Inc., Ashland Inc, Cycan Industries, Inc., Essential Ingredients, Inc. and Losorea Packaging, Inc. |
Thirdparty_plaintiff: |
Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. |
Case Number: |
5:2015cv00284 |
Filed: |
June 25, 2015 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
xxU.S. Outside District |
Presiding Judge: |
James C. Fox |
Nature of Suit: |
Personal Injury- Product Liability |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Both |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
April 13, 2016 |
Filing
117
Order Dismissing Case without prejudice to any party to move to reopen should settlement not be consummated on or before June 1, 2016. Unless the case is reopened, counsel are DIRECTED to file their Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice on or before June 1, 2016. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 4/13/2016. (Grady, B.)
|
March 15, 2016 |
Filing
114
ORDER denying 103 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/15/2016. (Grady, B.)
|
January 8, 2016 |
Filing
106
ORDER granting 81 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Bed, Bath & Beyond's claims against CyCan are DISMISSED without prejudice to refile a complaint sufficiently alleging CyCan's successor liability. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/8/2016. (Grady, B.)
|
January 7, 2016 |
Filing
105
ORDER denying 78 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/7/2016. (Edwards, S.)
|
December 30, 2015 |
Filing
102
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 75 Third-Party Defendant Ashland Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 80 Third-Party Defendant Essential Ingredients, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss. Counts 8, 9, 11 and 12 of the Third-Party Complaint [DE-24] are DISMISSED. The action may proceed with regard to Counts 10 and 13. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 12/30/2015. (Grady, B.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Search for this case: Leonard et al v. Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: William Leonard |
Represented By: |
Michael A. Trunk |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Plaintiff: Karen Leonard |
Represented By: |
Michael A. Trunk |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Defendant: Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. |
Represented By: |
David W. Hearn |
Represented By: |
Christopher K. Jones |
Represented By: |
David Loar McKenzie |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Napa Home & Garden, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Fuel Barons, Inc. |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Ashland Inc |
Represented By: |
Thomas F. Doherty |
Represented By: |
Barbara K. Gotthelf |
Represented By: |
Pressly M. Millen |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Cycan Industries, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Richard T. Boyette |
Represented By: |
Kara Gansmann |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Essential Ingredients, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Jonathan A. Berkelhammer |
Represented By: |
ANTHONY SYLVESTER |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_defendant: Losorea Packaging, Inc. |
Represented By: |
Richard T. Boyette |
Represented By: |
Kara Gansmann |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Thirdparty_plaintiff: Bed, Bath & Beyond, Inc. |
Represented By: |
David W. Hearn |
Represented By: |
Christopher K. Jones |
Represented By: |
David Loar McKenzie |
Search News |
[
Google News
| Marketwatch
| Wall Street Journal
| Financial Times
| New York Times
]
|
Search Finance |
[
Google Finance
| Yahoo Finance
| Hoovers
| SEC Edgar Filings
]
|
Search Web |
[
Unicourt
| Justia Dockets
| Legal Web
| Google
| Bing
| Yahoo
| Ask
]
|
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?