McCollum, et al. v. Robeson County, et al.
Plaintiff: Henry Lee McCollum and Leon Brown
Defendant: Robeson County, Town of Red Springs, Kenneth Sealey, Kenneth Snead, Joel Garth Locklear, Larry Floyd, Leroy Allen, Estate of Luther Haggins and Geraldinebritt Haggins
Case Number: 5:2015cv00451
Filed: August 31, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: ROBESON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 454 AMENDED JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/22/2021. (Sellers, N.)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER denying 439 Motion for New Trial. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/21/2021. (Sellers, N.)
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 433 ORDER - In light of their settlement with plaintiffs in this matter, the following motions by the Robeson County Sheriffs Office defendants are DENIED AS MOOT: motion for reconsideration regarding order on motion to bifurcate [DE 403]; oral motion for jury instruction made May 12, 2021 ; oral motion for directed verdict made May 12, 2021 ; and oral motion for directed verdict made May 13, 2021. Plaintiffs' motion for sanctions [DE 406] is DENIED AS MOOT in light of their settlement wit h the Robeson County Sheriffs Office defendants. Plaintiffs' oral motion for directed verdict as to liability made May 13, 2021, is DENIED AS MOOT in light of the jury's verdict. Defendants Allen and Fox's oral motion for jury instruction made with the Robeson County Sheriffs Office defendants on May 12, 2021, is DENIED AS MOOT in light of the rulings made during the charge conference. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/19/2021. (Stouch, L.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 409 ORDER - Defendants' motions in limine at [DE 368, 370, 374, 378, and 380] are DENIED. The Robeson County Sheriff's Office defendants' motion in limine at [DE 376] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/7/2021. (Stouch, L.)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER - The motion to join [DE 367] is GRANTED and the motion for bifurcation and special interrogatories [DE 364] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. The parties shall submit proposed special interrogatories in accordance with the foregoing not later than May 7, 2021, at 4:00 p.m. for the Court's review. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/3/2021. (Stouch, L.)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER denying 357 Motion in Limine and denying 359 Motion to Sever. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/15/2021. (Stouch, L.)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 363 ORDER granting 350 Motion in Limine; granting 352 Motion to Seal; and denying 354 Motion in Limine. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/24/2021. (Stouch, L.)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 329 ORDER - Plaintiffs' motion to amend the scheduling order and for leave to disclose substitute experts DE 312 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs shall disclose their substitute experts within sixty days from the date of entry of this order. Defendants s hall have sixty days to disclose any rebuttal experts. Defendant Sealey's motion in limine and motion for reconsideration DE 316 is DENIED. The jury trial in this matter shall commence during a late June 2020 term of court; the specific date, time, and location will be set by separate notice. Any discovery practice related to plaintiffs' newly designated experts shall conform to the late June trial setting. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/21/2020. (Stouch, L.)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 308 ORDER denying 305 Motion to Stay. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/1/2019. (Stouch, L.)
June 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting 292 Motion to Dismiss. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendants Town of Red Springs, Larry Floyd, and Paul Canady, Administrator C.T.A. of the Estate of Luther Haggins, are dismissed from this action with prejudice. This case shall rema in on the Court's docket and continue in due course againstall defendants not specifically named in the body of this Order. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety. Signed by United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/19/2018. (Edwards, S.)
April 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER allowing 265 Motion for Joinder and 266 Motion to Alter Judgment. Kimberly Pinchbeck, as limited guardian and conservator of the estate of Henry Lee McCollum, is ADDED as a party to this action on behalf of Henry Lee McCollum. The Court& #039;s order approving settlement [DE 253] is AMENDED to reflect that the Town of Red Springs defendants shall tender settlement funds for Henry Lee McCollum to Kimberly Pinchbeck as Trustee of the Henry Lee McCollum Irrevocable Trust of 2018. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/26/2018. (Stouch, L.)
March 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 260 ORDER denying without prejudice 123 Motion for Sanctions; denying 127 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 159 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 164 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 188 Motion for Leave to File Surreply; granting 258 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Joy Strickland terminated. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/1/2018. (Stouch, L.)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER approving plaintiffs' settlement with defendants Town of Red Springs, Larry Floyd, and Paul Canady, Administrator C.T.A. of the Estate of Luther Haggins; granting 235 Motion to Seal Document 234 PROPOSED SEALED EX PARTE Document; and denying 236 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 12/17/2017. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important information. (Stouch, L.)
October 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 233 ORDER denying without prejudice 192 Motion to Intervene; granting in part 211 Motion to determine whether the representation agreement is valid; granting 215 , 230 and 232 Motion to Seal; granting 216 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying 223 Motion to terminate guardian ad litem. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/23/2017. (Downing, L.)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 209 ORDER granting 157 Motion for Leave to File; granting 158 Motion to exceed page limitation; granting 163 Motion for Leave to File; denying 200 Motion to Seal. Proposed-intervenors shall either withdraw their pending motion to intervene [DE 192] or file a request for ruling on the motion within five (5) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/22/2017. (Stouch, L.)
May 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER denying 151 Motion to Seal; denying 156 Motion to Seal; denying 162 Motion to Seal Document ; denying 168 Motion to Seal; denying 176 Motion to Seal; denying 179 Motion to Seal; denying 181 Motion to Seal; denying 186 Motion to Seal. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/5/2015. (Stouch, L.)
May 31, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER granting 82 Motion to Substitute Party. J. Duane Gilliam, Guardian of the Estate of Leon Brown added. Geraldine Brown Ransom (Guardian of Leon Brown) terminated. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/31/2016. (Marsh, K)
May 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER denying as moot 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and granting 74 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/27/2016. (Marsh, K)
March 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/11/2016. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. (Romine, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCollum, et al. v. Robeson County, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robeson County
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Owen Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Red Springs
Represented By: Timothy C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Garris Neil Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Sealey
Represented By: James R. Morgan, Jr.
Represented By: Bradley Owen Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Snead
Represented By: Hal F. Askins
Represented By: Jennifer Joy Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel Garth Locklear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Floyd
Represented By: Timothy C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Garris Neil Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leroy Allen
Represented By: Hal F. Askins
Represented By: Jennifer Joy Strickland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Luther Haggins
Represented By: Timothy C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Garris Neil Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geraldinebritt Haggins
Represented By: Timothy C. Smith, Jr.
Represented By: Garris Neil Yarborough
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Lee McCollum
Represented By: Scott Brettschneider
Represented By: Jaime T. Halscott
Represented By: Patrick M. Megaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leon Brown
Represented By: Scott Brettschneider
Represented By: Jaime T. Halscott
Represented By: Patrick M. Megaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?