McNeill v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Anthony D. McNeill
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Case Number: 5:2015cv00646
Filed: December 9, 2015
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees in the matter of Anthony D. McNeill and Nancy A. Berryhill. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/29/2017. (Foell, S.)
March 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in the matter of Anthony D. McNeill against Nancy A. Berryhill, Acting Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/20/2017. (Foell, S.)
October 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting Defendant's 24 Motion for Leave to Appear by Video-Teleconference for the 11/10/16 hearing at 11:00. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 10/3/2016. (Foell, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeill v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony D. McNeill
Represented By: Charlotte Williams Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?