Valencell, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Plaintiff: Valencell, Inc.
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00001
Filed: January 4, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER granting 160 Motion to Seal 147 SEALED Order. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/29/2018. (Stouch, L.)
December 7, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 253 ORDER denying 219 Motion to Set Aside; denying 233 Motion for Leave to File; granting 235 Motion to refer the matter to Judge Gates to establish a schedule to complete discovery and file motions; denying 240 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 12/7/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
June 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER denying without prejudice 79 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 96 Motion to Stay; denying without prejudice 110 Motion to Supplement Invalidity Contentions; denying 149 Motion for Reconsideration ; granting 151 Motion to Seal Document ; denying without prejudice 202 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
April 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 155 Motion for Reconsideration. The portion of Valencells 7 April 2017 motion (D.E. 155) seeking a one-weekextension of the deadline in the courts 3 April 2017 Order (D.E. 153 1) applicable to its outsta nding supplemental document production that is not otherwise addressed in the instant Order is ALLOWED. Service of such supplemental document production effected by Valencell by 14 April 2017 shall be deemed timely. The portion of Valencells 7 April 2017 motion seeking reconsideration and withdrawal of the requirement in the courts 3 April 2017 Order that Valencell supplement its response to Apples Interrogatory No. 6 relating to Valencells damages claim is DENIED. Valencell shall serve a comple te, supplemental answer to Interrogatory No. 6, with a verificationfor it, as soon as practicable but in no event later than 21 April 2017. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for additional critical deadlines and information. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 4/17/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
February 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER denying 30 Motion to Transfer Case; granting 126 Motion for In-Person Case Management Conference; denying as moot 19 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim.The court will hold the conference on February 28, 2017, at 1:00 p.m. i n courtroom one of the Terry Sanford Federal Building and United States Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. The parties are directed to submit proposed revisions to the schedule no later than February 21, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/6/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
December 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 102 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 12/12/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER granting 36 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 40 Motion to Seal Document; granting 48 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by U.S. Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/19/2016. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencell, Inc. v. Apple Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencell, Inc.
Represented By: Lynne A. Borchers
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Bragalone
Represented By: Patrick J. Conroy
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rastegar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Charles F. Marshall, III
Represented By: Craig Daniel Schauer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?