November 26, 2018 |
Filing
135
ORDER denying 125 Motion for New Trial and in the alternative, to Alter or Amend Judgment and 134 Amended Rule 59(d) and (e) Motion for New Trial and In the Alternative, To Alter or Amend Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/26/2018.(Certified copy served via U.S. Mail upon Pamela Melvin, 4949 Fieldcrest Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28303) (Tripp, S.)
|
October 3, 2018 |
Filing
132
ORDER - Plaintiff's motion for extension is ALLOWED and plaintiff has until October 24, 2018, to file a memorandum in support of her motion for new trial or in the alternative to alter or amend judgment 125 . However, pl aintiff has not demonstrated a basis for protective order or for sanctions upon the record in this case. Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for protective order or in the alternative for sanctions is DENIED. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/3/2018. (A copy of this Order was sent via US mail to Pamela Melvin, 4949 Fieldcrest Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28303.) (Collins, S.)
|
August 8, 2018 |
Filing
124
JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/8/2018. (Collins, S.)
|
January 26, 2018 |
Filing
114
ORDER granting 112 Motion for Extension of Time to File; granting 113 Motion to Seal Document. Plaintiff is allowed up to and including 2/22/18 to file amended complaint. The Clerk is directed to seal the medical progres s notes attached to plaintiff's motion for extension of time. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/26/2018. (A copy of this order was sent via US mail to Pamela Melvin, 4949 Fieldcrest Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28303.) (Collins, S.)
|
December 22, 2017 |
Filing
111
ORDER - The court DENIES plaintiff's motion for clarification. To the extent plaintiff seeks permission to reassert claims against those dismissed parties from prior order, the court DENIES plaintiff's motion to join additional parties. Plaintiff's motion for extension is ALLOWED. Plaintiff has up to and until 1/22/18 to file amended complaint against defendant Guardian. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/22/2017. (A copy of this order was sent via US mail to Pamela Melvin, 4949 Fieldcrest Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28303). (Collins, S.)
|
November 20, 2017 |
Filing
109
ORDER - Where plaintiff failed to show cause within the appropriate time for her failure to perfect service upon defendants Tracy Naylor, Ginger Hunsuker, Kathy Reed, Venkata G. Booduluri, Massey Hill Drug Company, Inc., Masse y Hill Pharmacy, LLC, and Jonna Squires, plaintiffs claims against those defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Plaintiffs motion to seal [DE103] is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. The clerk is DIRECTED to unseal the following exhibits attac hed to plaintiffs motion for default judgment against defendant Guardian: [DE102-2]; [DE 102-3]; [DE102-4]; [DE 102-12]. The clerk is also DIRECTED to unseal the courts September 29, 2017, order. [DE106]. Based on the foregoing, plaintiffs response, which the court construes as including a motion for reconsideration of the courts September 29, 2017, order is DENIED IN PART AND GRANTED IN PART. [DE107]. Plaintiff is GRANTED LEAVE to file amended complaint against Guardian Hart Medical Care within 30 days from date of entry of this order. Plaintiff is NOTICED that her failure to file amended complaint within the appropriate time or failure to serve defendant Guardian timely, absent court-ordered time extension, will result in dismissal of her claims against defendant Guardian with prejudice, and the closing of this case. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/20/2017. (Collins, S.)
|
August 24, 2017 |
Filing
98
ORDER granting 92 Motion for entry of an Order relieving it of its obligation to respond to filings by Melvin, beyond docket entry 90 , prior to the court's adjudication of the parties' cross motions for summary judgment. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/24/2017. (Collins, S.)
|
November 23, 2016 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting 33 Motion to Seal 32 PROPOSED SEALED Document - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/23/2016. (Baker, C.)
|
June 30, 2016 |
Filing
6
ORDER granting 5 Motion for Extension of Time and granting 5 Motion for Summons to be Re-Issued. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/29/2016. Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to 4949 Fieldcrest Drive, Fayetteville, NC 28306. (Romine, L.)
|