Sahoo et al v. Gleaton et al
Plaintiff: Rachel Sahoo and Gourab Sahoo
Defendant: Jamie Gleaton and Kitty Hart
Case Number: 5:2016cv00153
Filed: April 7, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Fox
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER STAYING CASE. The trial set for September 3, 2019 is TERMINATED. The parties shall jointly notify this Court within 10 days of the filing of the Fourth Circuit's mandate of the posture of the case and the issues which remain for adjudication. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/19/2019. (Stouch, L.)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER denying 113 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 124 Motion to Seal; and granting 137 Motion to Seal. The jury trial in this matter shall commence on Tuesday, September 3, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. at the United States Courthouse, 310 New Bern Avenue, Raleigh, North Carolina. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/31/2019. (Stouch, L.)
October 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 101 Motion to Quash; granting in part and denying in part 104 Motion to Intervene; granting 110 Motion to Seal Document. Motions due by 11/5/2018. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by Chief Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/20/2018. (Sellers, N.)
August 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying 89 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/29/2018. (Sellers, N.)
April 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 71 Motion to Amend and granting 73 Motion to Consolidate Cases. These actions shall proceed under the caption at case number 5:16-CV-153-BO. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/18/2018. (Stouch, L.)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER denying without prejudice 49 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/5/2018. Defendants may refile at the conclusion of the discovery period. (Stouch, L.)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 44 Motion for Exemption from Mediation. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/7/2017. (Stouch, L.)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting in part and denying as moot in part 23 Motion to Dismiss. Specifically, Count 1 is DISMISSED with prejudice as to Gleaton's alleged misconduct regarding the Petition and her state court testimony. In all other respects, Defend ants' motion is DENIED AS MOOT. Plaintiff shall file a Second Amended Complaint no later than 4/24/2017. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint within 14 days after service. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 3/23/2017. (Grady, B.)
January 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Seal 34 PROPOSED SEALED Exhibit. Signed by Senior Judge James C. Fox on 1/26/2017. (Grady, B.)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 30 Motion to Strike. The clerk is directed to permanently seal the complaint [DE-1], amended complaint [DE-8], and response to Defendants' motion to dismiss [DE-29] and its attached exhibits [DE-29- 1, -29-2]. Plaintiffs are directed, by no later than 2/6/2017, to refile the amended complaint and response to Defendants' motion to dismiss utilizing only the minors' initials in conformity with Rule 5.2. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr.on 1/24/2017. (Grady, B.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sahoo et al v. Gleaton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rachel Sahoo
Represented By: David S. Rudolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gourab Sahoo
Represented By: David S. Rudolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Gleaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kitty Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?