White v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Plaintiff: White and Margaret H. White
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00176
Filed: April 14, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: W Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Margaret H. White (Cochran, Chad)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #14 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 3/24/2017. (Marsh, K)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Certificate of Service filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. . (Scott, Bryan)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan G. Scott on behalf of Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Scott, Bryan)
January 30, 2017 Opinion or Order NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: #25 Notice of Appearance. Federal Civil Rule 5(d)(1) requires that a certificate of service be filed. Counsel is directed to file a captioned document titled Certificate of Service using the Certificate of Service event located under the Service of Process category, being sure to link the appropriate document when prompted to do so. (Marsh, K)
December 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Motion to Amend. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 12/20/2016. (Stouch, L.)
December 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr regarding: #23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Scheduling Order. (Marsh, K)
December 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MOTION to Amend/Correct #20 Scheduling Order, filed by Margaret H. White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cochran, Chad)
September 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Selection of Andy Little as mediator filed by Margaret H. White. (Cochran, Chad)
September 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt: regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss. (Marsh, K)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Adams, Richard)
September 2, 2016 Opinion or Order TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (TEXT ONLY): Jury Trial set for 8/28/2017 at 09:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before Senior Judge W. Earl Britt. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/2/2016. (CHAM, ACP)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER as to all parties: Discovery due by 4/1/2017. Motions due by 5/1/2017. Counsel should read order in its entirety for critical deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/29/2016. Order to Senior US District Judge W. Earl Britt for trial order. (Marsh, K)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Adams, Richard)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court regarding: #19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. (Marsh, K)
August 29, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting defendant's consent motion for extension of time #19 . Defendant shall have through and including September 2, 2016, to file a reply in support of the motion to dismiss. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 8/29/2016. (Hockaday, A.)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Margaret H. White. (Cochran, Chad)
August 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Remark - #18 Rule 26(f) report referred to United States Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr with request for scheduling order. (Marsh, K)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Margaret H. White. (Cochran, Chad)
July 12, 2016 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER granting plaintiff's #16 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response. Plaintiff has through and including August 16, 2016, to file her response to defendant's #14 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 7/12/2016. (Hockaday, A.)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Margaret H. White. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Cochran, Chad)
July 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court: #16 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss. (Romine, L.)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Michael Dickman, #2 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases) (Adams, Richard)
July 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Adams, Richard)
July 1, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DENYING as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 7/1/2016. (Romine, L.)
June 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Motion Submitted to Senior Judge W. Earl Britt: #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss. (Romine, L.)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 6/21/2016. (Marsh, K)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Chase Bank USA, N.A. answer due 7/5/2016. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 6/16/2016. (Marsh, K)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Adams, Richard)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court regarding: #10 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #8 Amended Complaint. (Marsh, K)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 9 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Margaret H. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cochran, Chad)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Chase Bank USA, N.A., filed by Margaret H. White. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Cochran, Chad)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Memorandum in Support regarding #6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Michael Dickman, #2 Exhibit B - Unpublished Cases, #3 Exhibit C - Relevant Excerpt) (Adams, Richard)
May 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chase Bank USA, N.A's Partial Motion to Dismiss filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Adams, Richard)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Margaret H. White (Cochran, Chad)
April 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Chad J. Cochran on behalf of Margaret H. White. (Cochran, Chad)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE to plaintiff's counsel regarding removal of case and requirement to file Notice of Appearance. Served on plaintiff's counsel via US Mail on April 14, 2016. (Felder, J)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Chase Bank USA, N.A. (Adams, Richard)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chase Bank USA, N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-3649037), filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - All filings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Adams, Richard)
April 14, 2016 Opinion or Order NOTICE to Counsel - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Felder, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret H. White
Represented By: Chad J. Cochran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Represented By: Bryan G. Scott
Represented By: Richard Scott Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?