McCrory et al v. United States of America et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Patrick L. McCrory and Frank Perry
Defendant: United States of America, United States Department of Justice, Loretta E. Lynch and Vanita Gupta
Movant: Phil Berger, Tim Moore, North Carolinians for Privacy and Steven Glenn Johnson
Case Number: 5:2016cv00238
Filed: May 9, 2016
Court: North Carolina Eastern District Court
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 19, 2017 57 Featured Case ORDER denying 56 Motion to Alter Judgment. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/18/2017. Certified copy sent to Steven-Glenn: Johnson via US Mail to 208 Nydegg Road, New Bern, NC 28562. (Stouch, L.)
October 24, 2016 Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: 56 MOTION to Alter Judgment. (Stouch, L.)
September 29, 2016 56 MOTION to Alter Judgment filed by Steven Glenn Johnson. (Stouch, L.)
September 16, 2016 55 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry as to All Defendants (Without Prejudice). (Stewart, William)
September 13, 2016 Reset Hearing as to 48 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion Hearing set for Thursday 9/22/2016 at 11:00 AM in Raleigh - 7th Floor - Courtroom 2 before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. Change in date and courtroom (Romine, L.)
September 8, 2016 54 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion 48 MOTION to Dismiss: Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2016 at 11:00 AM in Raleigh - 6th Floor Courtroom before District Judge Terrence W. Boyle. (Romine, L.)
September 1, 2016 53 Featured Case ORDER denying movant Johnson's 33 Motion to Intervene. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/1/2016. Certified copy sent to pro se movant via US Mail to 208 Nydegg Road, New Bern, NC 28562. (Romine, L.)
July 27, 2016 Motions Submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: 33 MOTION to Intervene and 48 MOTION to Dismiss. (Romine, L.)
July 26, 2016 52 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vanita Gupta, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Amdur, Spencer)
July 22, 2016 51 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Charlotte Observer Article, # 2 Exhibit B - Remarks of Attorney General Lynch, # 3 Exhibit C - Order in Case No. 1:16-cv-00425-TDS-JEP (M.D.N.C.)) (Stewart, William)
July 18, 2016 50 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Steven Glenn Johnson. (Romine, L.)
July 13, 2016 49 Featured Case ORDER regarding 48 MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' response to the motion shall be filed not later than July 22, 2016. Any reply by defendants shall be filed not later than July 26, 2016. A hearing will be held on the motion, if necessary, at Raleigh, North Carolina. The date and time will be set by separate notice. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 7/13/2016. (Romine, L.)
July 12, 2016 48 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vanita Gupta, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3) (Amdur, Spencer)
June 29, 2016 47 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding 33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Stewart, William)
June 27, 2016 46 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Vanita Gupta, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. Amendment to 45 Memorandum in Opposition Amending Certificate of Service (Amdur, Spencer)
June 27, 2016 45 Memorandum in Opposition regarding 33 MOTION to Intervene of Steven Glenn Johnson filed by Vanita Gupta, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Amdur, Spencer)
June 21, 2016 44 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert C. Stephens on behalf of Patrick L. McCrory. (Stephens, Robert)
June 20, 2016 43 Featured Case ORDER allowing North Carolinians for Privacy's 22 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/20/2016. (Romine, L.)
June 17, 2016 42 RESPONSE in Support regarding 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Duncan, Stuart)
June 17, 2016 41 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Campbell, James)
June 17, 2016 40 RESPONSE to Motion regarding 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Stewart, William)
June 16, 2016 39 Notice of Appearance filed by Michael James on behalf of All Defendants. (James, Michael)
June 14, 2016 38 Memorandum in Opposition regarding 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Vanita Gupta, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice, United States of America. (Amdur, Spencer)
June 14, 2016 37 Notice of Appearance filed by Spencer E. Amdur on behalf of All Defendants. (Amdur, Spencer)
June 13, 2016 36 Featured Case ORDER allowing Phil Berger's and Tim Moore's 11 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/13/2016. (Romine, L.)
June 9, 2016 35 Notice of Appearance filed by Gene C. Schaerr on behalf of Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Schaerr, Gene)
June 7, 2016 34 Featured Case ORDER denying 9 Motion to Transfer Case. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/7/2016. (Marsh, K)
June 6, 2016 33 MOTION to Intervene filed by Steven Glenn Johnson. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A - Correspondence and Oath of Office, # 3 Exhibit B - Document - Page 3 of 12, # 4 Exhibit C - Register of Deeds Document) (Marsh, K)
May 26, 2016 32 Featured Case ORDER - Consolidation of case No. 5:16-CV-240-FL with this matter will be allowed if permitted by the judge to whom the General Assembly's case is currently assigned. The Court makes no determination as to the motion to consolidate filed by North Carolinians for Privacy, case No. 5:16-CV-245-FL, at this time. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/26/2016. The parties are reminded to read the attached order in its entirety. (Downing, L.)
May 25, 2016 31 RESPONSE to Motion regarding 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Stewart, William)
May 24, 2016 30 Notice of Appearance for non-district by John Matthew Sharp on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Sharp, John)
May 24, 2016 29 Notice of Appearance for non-district by David A. Cortman on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Cortman, David)
May 24, 2016 28 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Jonathan Caleb Dalton on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dalton, Jonathan)
May 24, 2016 27 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Joseph E. La Rue on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (La Rue, Joseph)
May 24, 2016 26 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Kristen K. Waggoner on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Waggoner, Kristen)
May 24, 2016 25 Notice of Appearance for non-district by James A. Campbell on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Campbell, James)
May 24, 2016 24 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Jeremy D. Tedesco on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Tedesco, Jeremy)
May 24, 2016 23 Memorandum in Support regarding 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dewart, Deborah)
May 24, 2016 22 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by North Carolinians for Privacy. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Dewart, Deborah)
May 24, 2016 21 Financial Disclosure Statement by North Carolinians for Privacy (Dewart, Deborah)
May 24, 2016 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Deborah J. Dewart on behalf of North Carolinians for Privacy. (Dewart, Deborah)
May 23, 2016 19 Affidavit of Service for summons and complaint filed by Patrick L. McCrory served on Vanita Gupta - Asst AG on 5/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Gupta - civil process, # 2 Exhibit B - Gupta - AG, # 3 Exhibit C- Gupta - USDOJ) (Stewart, William)
May 23, 2016 18 Affidavit of Service for summons and complaint filed by Patrick L. McCrory served on Loretta Lynch - AG on 5/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Lynch - civil process, # 2 Exhibit B- Lynch - AG, # 3 Exhibit C- Lynch - USDOJ) (Stewart, William)
May 23, 2016 17 Affidavit of Service for summons and complaint filed by Patrick L. McCrory served on USDOJ on 5/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - DOJ-civil process, # 2 Exhibit B - USDOJ, # 3 Exhibit C - USDOJ - AG) (Stewart, William)
May 23, 2016 16 Affidavit of Service for summons and complaint filed by Patrick L. McCrory served on USA on 5/13/2016. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - usa-civil process clerk, # 2 Exhibit B - usa-usag) (Stewart, William)
May 23, 2016 Featured Case TEXT ORDER: Plaintiffs in later-filed, related case 5:16-CV-240-FL have filed in this matter a motion to consolidate the two cases in the interests of judicial economy, efficient handling, and consistent resolution of common issues. DE 11 . The Court will defer its ruling on the pending motion to transfer DE 9 in order to consider the motion to consolidate. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 5/23/2016. (Romine, L.)
May 23, 2016 15 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Karl S. Bowers, Jr on behalf of Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Bowers, Karl)
May 23, 2016 14 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert D. Potter, Jr on behalf of Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Potter, Robert)
May 23, 2016 13 Notice of Appearance filed by Stuart K. Duncan on behalf of Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Duncan, Stuart)
May 23, 2016 12 Memorandum in Support regarding 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Duncan, Stuart)
May 23, 2016 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by Phil Berger, Tim Moore. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Duncan, Stuart)
May 20, 2016 Motion Submitted to US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle: regarding 9 MOTION to Transfer Case (Unopposed). (Romine, L.)
May 17, 2016 10 Memorandum in Support regarding 9 MOTION to Transfer Case (Unopposed) filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Complaint in USA v. State of NC, # 2 Exhibit Complaint in Carcano v. McCrory, # 3 Exhibit 1st Amended Complaint in Carcano v. McCrory, # 4 Supplement Landers v. Dawson (unpublished opinion), # 5 Supplement Calloway Golf v. Corp. Trade (unpublished opinion)) (Stewart, William)
May 17, 2016 9 MOTION to Transfer Case (Unopposed) filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Stewart, William)
May 9, 2016 8 Summonses Issued as to Vanita Gupta, Loretta E. Lynch, United States Department of Justice, and United States of America. Counsel is directed to print summonses and effect service. (Romine, L.)
May 9, 2016 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by Frank Perry (Stewart, William)
May 9, 2016 6 Financial Disclosure Statement by Patrick L. McCrory (Stewart, William)
May 9, 2016 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Brennan Tyler Brooks on behalf of Patrick L. McCrory. (Brooks, Brennan)
May 9, 2016 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Frank J. Gordon on behalf of Patrick L. McCrory. (Gordon, Frank)
May 9, 2016 3 Notice of Appearance filed by William W. Stewart, Jr on behalf of Patrick L. McCrory. (Stewart, William)
May 9, 2016 2 Notice filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry regarding 1 Complaint, Proposed Summons. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Summons, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons) (Stewart, William)
May 9, 2016 NOTICE to Counsel - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Felder, J)
May 9, 2016 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: Proposed summonses at 1 Complaint. Pursuant to Section B(3) of the CM/ECF Policy Manual available on the court's website, when using fillable PDF forms, the court requires that these forms be "flattened." Counsel is directed to flatten and refile the proposed summonses using the event "Notice-(other)." (Felder, J)
May 9, 2016 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-3674980.), filed by Patrick L. McCrory, Frank Perry. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons, # 3 Proposed Summons, # 4 Proposed Summons, # 5 Proposed Summons) (Stewart, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McCrory et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick L. McCrory
Represented By: Karl S. Bowers, Jr.
Represented By: Brennan Tyler Brooks
Represented By: Frank J. Gordon
Represented By: William W. Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Perry
Represented By: Karl S. Bowers, Jr.
Represented By: William W. Stewart, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Justice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loretta E. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vanita Gupta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Phil Berger
Represented By: Stuart K. Duncan
Represented By: Robert D. Potter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Tim Moore
Represented By: Stuart K. Duncan
Represented By: Robert D. Potter, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: North Carolinians for Privacy
Represented By: James A. Campbell
Represented By: David A. Cortman
Represented By: Jonathan Caleb Dalton
Represented By: Deborah J. Dewart
Represented By: Joseph E. La Rue
Represented By: John Matthew Sharp
Represented By: Jeremy D. Tedesco
Represented By: Kristen K. Waggoner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: Steven Glenn Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?