Avent et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: |
Verniecee Whitaker Avent and Estate of Lucinda Alston Whitaker |
Defendant: |
State Farm Fire and Casualty Company |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00278 |
Filed: |
May 20, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
NASH |
Presiding Judge: |
Terrence W. Boyle |
Nature of Suit: |
Insurance |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 20, 2017 |
Filing
49
ORDER denying 44 Motion for sanctions and granting 46 Motion to Withdraw. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/18/2017. Certified copy sent to Verniecee Whitaker Avent via US Mail to 701 Hammond Street, Rocky Mount, NC 27804. (Stouch, L.)
|
June 20, 2017 |
Filing
41
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 39 Motion to Compel. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 6/20/2017. Parties are reminded to read the order in its entirety for important deadlines and information. Certified copy sent to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to 701 Hammond Street, Rocky Mount, NC 27804. (Stouch, L.)
|
March 8, 2017 |
Filing
38
ORDER denying without prejudice 29 Motion to Order Mediation; denying as moot 30 Motion for Issuance of a Decision; denying as moot 35 Motion to Compel Disclosure of Attorney. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 3/8/2017. Certified copy sent to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to 701 Hammond Street, Rocky Mount, NC 27804. (Stouch, L.)
|
January 25, 2017 |
Filing
28
ORDER denying 22 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 1/25/2017. Certified copy sent to pro se plaintiffs via US Mail to Verniecee Whitaker Avent, 701 Hammond Street, Rocky Mount, NC 27804. (Stouch, L.)
|
October 24, 2016 |
Filing
18
ORDER denying 6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Amend; denying 17 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs shall file not later than November 14, 2016, an amended complaint reflecting the additional factual matter as alleged in the amended complaint filed on August 31, 2016. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 10/21/2016. Certified copy sent to pro se plaintiff via US Mail to 701 Hammond Street, Rocky Mount, NC 27804. (Stouch, L.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?