Morgan v. Spivey, et al
Plaintiff: |
Michael J. Morgan |
Defendant: |
Ricky Jason Spivey, Casey Lane Miller, Joshua Kyle Legan, Donnie Harrison and Wake County, North Carolina |
Case Number: |
5:2016cv00365 |
Filed: |
June 10, 2016 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
WAKE |
Presiding Judge: |
Louise Wood Flanagan |
Nature of Suit: |
Other Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
September 17, 2019 |
Filing
199
ORDER finding as moot 184 Motion to Intervene; granting 190 Motion for Reconsideration regarding 177 Order on Motion in Limine, Order on Motion to Bifurcate. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/17/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
September 5, 2019 |
Filing
177
ORDER denying 143 Motion in Limine to Bar Plaintiff's Use of Alternative Tactics Evidence/Argument; denying 149 Motion in Limine; granting Oral Motion in alternative to Bifurcate issue of punitive damages. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/5/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
January 2, 2019 |
Filing
124
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 110 Motion for Summary Judgment. The parties are DIRECTED to confer and file within 21 days from date of entry of this order a joint status report specifying the estimated length o f the trial, three alternative suggested trial dates, and suggested alternative dispute resolution techniques to be employed prior to trial in attempt to resolve the issues between the parties. Upon receipt of the parties' report, unless advance conference with the court is requested therein, the court will enter such further order as is warranted regarding pretrial and trial scheduling. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/2/2019. (Collins, S.)
|
December 8, 2017 |
Filing
107
ORDER - Defendants' joint motion to compel [DE99] is DENIED and plaintiff's motion for protective order [DE105] is GRANTED. Defendants request for attorney's fees is DENIED. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/8/2017. (Collins, S.)
|
September 29, 2017 |
Filing
96
ORDER granting in part and denying in part 71 Motion to Dismiss and granting in part and denying in part 76 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 9/29/2017. (Tripp, S.)
|
November 14, 2016 |
Filing
58
ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Partial Judgment on the Pleadings and granting 51 First Motion to Amend 1 Complaint - Plaintiff shall file and served its amended complaint within 14 days. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/14/2016. (Tripp, S.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?