Stith v. Colvin
Plaintiff: Pamela Stith
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Case Number: 5:2016cv00689
Filed: October 2, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAYNE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Court hereby awards Plaintiff $2,782.40 in attorney fees under the Equal Access to Justice Act (28 U.S.C. § 2412(c) and (d)), paid to Plaintiff's attorney if ther e is no debt that qualifies under the Treasury Offset Program (31 U.S.C. § 3716). If there is such a debt, any fee remaining after offset will be payable to Plaintiff and delivered to Plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/12/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
November 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court adopts the conclusions in the M&R [D.E. 24]. Plaintiffs motion for judgment on the pleadings [D.E. 18] is GRANTED, defendant's motion for judgment on the pleadings [D.E. 21] is DENIED, and the action is REMANDED to the Commissioner under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/29/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER adopting 24 Memorandum and Recommendations; granting 18 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stith v. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Stith
Represented By: Kyu-Eun Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?