United States of America v. McOuat
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Maureen Denise McOuat
Case Number: 5:2016cv00691
Filed: July 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: HARNETT
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Qui Tam (31 U.S.C. § 3729(a))
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that plaintiff have and recover from Defendant penalties in the sum of $32,000.00. The Parties stipulate and agree that Defendant is without the ability to pay judgment interest, and therefore reas onable efforts to collect this judgment interest would likely be ineffective. Therefore, the Plaintiff United States waives judgment interest pursuant to 18 U.S.C.A. § 3612. This judgment shall bear no interest. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/14/2018. (Sellers, N.)
May 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting 35 Motion to Stay Discovery Deadlines. It is therefore ORDERED that the discovery in this case is hereby stayed for a period of 90 days pending the submission of the settlement agreement in this matter. It is further ORDERED that the deadlines in this case, including the discovery and dispositive motions deadlines, are likewise stayed for the same period. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 5/11/2018. (Edwards, S.)
December 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER denying 23 Motion Directed Reference to Bankruptcy Court; denying 21 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 12/19/2017. (Edwards, S.)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting 28 Motion to Stay Discovery and all deadlines, including discovery and dispositive motions deadlines, while the Defendants Motion to Dismiss 21 and Motion for a Directed Reference to Bankruptcy Court 23 are pending. The parties shall submit a proposed scheduling order within 30 days of the Court's ruling on Defendants motions. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 8/1/2017. (Edwards, S.)
February 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting 9 Motion Exempt This Case from Mediation, Eliminate the Requirement to Select a Mediator within 21 Days and for a Modified Scheduling Order Reflecting Same. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 2/24/2017. (Marsh, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. McOuat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Rudy E. Renfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Denise McOuat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?