Optima Tobacco Corporation v. U.S. Flue-Cured Tobacco Growers, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Optima Tobacco Corporation
Defendant: U.S. Flue-Cured Tobacco Growers, Inc. and UETA, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00889
Filed: November 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER granting 137 Motion to Allow Witness to Testify by Video. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/6/2020. (Sellers, N.)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting 131 Motion for Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference. The Final Pretrial Conference in this matter will be held telephonically and that further details will be provided by the Court in advance of the Conference. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/6/2020. (Sellers, N.)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER - The court GRANTS IN PART and DENIES IN PART defendants' motions for summary judgment 90 , 92 , and DISMISSES U.S. Flue-Cured as a defendant. Optima Tobacco, U.S. Flue-Cured, and UETA shall engage in a settlement conference with United States Magistrate Judge Gates. The court will set the case for trial by separate order. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 9/30/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER granting 110 Motion to Seal Document. Consistently with Magistrate Judge Gates's order, the court GRANTS defendants' motion to seal [D.E. 110] and directs the clerk to maintain under seal the unredacted memoranda of law [D.E. 91-1, 93, 97-1, 100-1, 102]. The court shall consider those memoranda in ruling on defendants' motions for summary judgment, which remain pending. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 8/28/2019. (Sellers, N.)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 95 Motion to Seal Document ; granting in part and denying in part 103 Motion to Seal Document. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 8/20/2019. (Sellers, N.)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 85 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER (As Modified) - Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 5/9/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 10 Motion to Seal. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 7/27/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
April 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER denying 31 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 18 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Whether plaintiff will survive a motion for summary judgment is an issue for another day. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 4/10/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Optima Tobacco Corporation v. U.S. Flue-Cured Tobacco Growers, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Optima Tobacco Corporation
Represented By: Caroline Batchelor McLean
Represented By: Gary J. Rickner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Flue-Cured Tobacco Growers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UETA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?