Valencell, Inc v. Bragi Store, LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Valencell, Inc
Defendant: Bragi Store, LLC, Bragi North America, LLC and Bragi GmbH
Counter Defendant: Valencell, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2016cv00895
Filed: November 11, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35 U.S.C. ยง 271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2023 Submitted #58 Joint Status Report to United States District Judge James C. Dever III. (Mann, Stephanie)
July 12, 2023 Filing 58 STATUS REPORT by Valencell, Inc. (Parsons, Gavin)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion to Withdraw. Jeffrey R. Bragalone, Patrick J. Conroy, Jonathan H. Rastegar, Jerry D. Tice and Brian P. Herrmann are terminated as Counsel for Valencell, Inc. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/30/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion to Withdraw. Christopher T. Graebe and Morningstar Law Group are terminated as counsel of record for Valencell, Inc. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/30/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 28, 2023 Motions Submitted to District Judge James C. Dever III regarding #55 MOTION to Withdraw Jeffrey R. Bragalone, Patrick J. Conroy, Jonathan H. Rastegar, Jerry D. Tice and Brian P. Herrmann as Counsel for Valencell, Inc., #54 MOTION to Withdraw. (Mann, Stephanie)
June 27, 2023 Filing 55 MOTION to Withdraw Jeffrey R. Bragalone, Patrick J. Conroy, Jonathan H. Rastegar, Jerry D. Tice and Brian P. Herrmann as Counsel for Valencell, Inc. filed by Valencell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
June 26, 2023 Filing 54 MOTION to Withdraw filed by Valencell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion to Withdraw) (Graebe, Christopher)
June 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER - Not later than July 14, 2023, the parties shall file a joint statement updating the court on the status of this case. That report shall advise the court of the status of the IPR. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/22/2023. (Mann, Stephanie)
August 18, 2022 Filing 52 Notice of Appearance filed by William Gabriel Pagan on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Pagan, William)
August 18, 2022 Filing 51 Notice of Appearance filed by Gavin B. Parsons on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Parsons, Gavin)
June 24, 2022 Filing 50 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Valencell, Inc. (Graebe, Christopher)
June 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER - Not later than June 24, 2022, the parties shall file a joint statement updating the court on the status of this case. That report shall advise the court of the status of the IPR. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 6/8/2022. (Sellers, N.) Modified on 6/27/2022 to correct the document description. (Sellers, N.)
January 4, 2021 #48 Status Report submitted to United States District Judge James C. Dever III. (Sellers, N.)
December 31, 2020 Filing 48 STATUS REPORT filed Jointly by Valencell, Inc. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
December 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 STATUS REPORT ORDER - Not later than January 4, 2021, the parties shall file a joint statement updating the court on the status of this case. That report shall advise the court of the status of the IPR. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/18/2020. (Sellers, N.)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #44 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Peter D. Siddoway terminated. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/11/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
January 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER granting #43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Lynne A. Borchers terminated. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 1/11/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
January 2, 2018 Filing 44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Peter D. Siddoway filed by Valencell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Siddoway, Peter)
January 2, 2018 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lynne A. Borchers filed by Valencell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Borchers, Lynne)
January 2, 2018 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #44 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Peter D. Siddoway, #43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Lynne A. Borchers. (Briggeman, N.)
December 29, 2017 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher T. Graebe on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Graebe, Christopher)
September 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER granting #32 Motion to Stay. The action is STAYED pending completion of the IPR. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 9/20/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
August 29, 2017 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #32 MOTION to Stay. (Briggeman, N.)
August 24, 2017 Filing 40 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #32 MOTION to Stay filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
August 24, 2017 Filing 39 Declaration in Support of Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Stay by Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC, Bragi GmbH filed by Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC, Bragi GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions, #2 Exhibit 2 - July 12, 2017 Email from Conroy to Bergmann, #3 Exhibit 3 - "Access" Page of Valencell Website) (Sun, Paul)
August 10, 2017 Filing 38 RESPONSE in Opposition regarding #32 MOTION to Stay filed by Valencell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Leboeuf, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Brian Herrmann, #3 Exhibit Exerpt of Petition for a Writ of Certiorari in Oil States, #4 Exhibit Order, D.E. 260, No. 213CV01015JRGRSP (E.D. Tex 2017)) (Rastegar, Jonathan)
August 1, 2017 Filing 37 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 8/1/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
July 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Valencell, Inc. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/28/2017. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. (Briggeman, N.)
July 27, 2017 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (Briggeman, N.)
July 26, 2017 Filing 35 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Valencell, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EX. A - Stipulated Protective Order, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order on Motion) (Rastegar, Jonathan)
July 24, 2017 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance filed by Jerry D Tice on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Tice, Jerry)
July 20, 2017 Filing 33 Memorandum in Support regarding #32 MOTION to Stay filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
July 20, 2017 Filing 32 MOTION to Stay filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kelly Margolis Dagger, #2 Exhibit 1- IPR2017-00315, #3 Exhibit 2- IPR2017-00319, #4 Exhibit 3- IPR2017-00321, #5 Text of Proposed Order) (Sun, Paul)
July 15, 2017 Filing 31 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
May 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/31/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
May 30, 2017 Filing 29 Plaintiff Valencell, Inc.'s ANSWER to #28 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Valencell, Inc.. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
May 9, 2017 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Valencell, Inc. by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
May 9, 2017 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance for non-district by William C. Bergmann on behalf of All Defendants. (Bergmann, William)
February 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Bragi GmbH answer due 5/9/2017; Bragi North America, LLC answer due 5/9/2017; Bragi Store, LLC answer due 5/9/2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 2/8/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
February 8, 2017 Motion Referred to Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court regarding: #22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Briggeman, N.)
February 7, 2017 Filing 25 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bragi Store, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bragi GmbH for Bragi Store, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
February 7, 2017 Filing 24 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bragi North America, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Bragi GmbH for Bragi North America, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
February 7, 2017 Filing 23 Financial Disclosure Statement by Bragi GmbH (Sun, Paul)
February 7, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint, filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Sun, Paul)
February 7, 2017 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance filed by Kelly Margolis Dagger on behalf of Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Dagger, Kelly)
February 7, 2017 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul K. Sun, Jr on behalf of Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Sun, Paul)
February 2, 2017 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance filed by Brian P. Herrmann on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Herrmann, Brian)
February 2, 2017 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance filed by Jonathan H. Rastegar on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
February 2, 2017 Filing 17 Notice of Appearance filed by Patrick J. Conroy on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Conroy, Patrick)
February 2, 2017 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance filed by Jeffrey R. Bragalone on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Bragalone, Jeffrey)
January 26, 2017 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valencell, Inc.. Bragi Store, LLC served on 1/18/2017, answer due 2/8/2017. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
January 26, 2017 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valencell, Inc.. Bragi North America, LLC served on 1/18/2017, answer due 2/8/2017. (Rastegar, Jonathan)
January 17, 2017 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Bragi North America, LLC. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Briggeman, N.)
January 17, 2017 Filing 12 Notice filed by Valencell, Inc. Proposed Summons to Bragi North America, LLC. (Borchers, Lynne)
January 17, 2017 Filing 11 Notice of Change of Address filed by Peter D. Siddoway filed by on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Siddoway, Peter)
January 17, 2017 Filing 10 Notice of Change of Address filed by Lynne A. Borchers filed by on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Borchers, Lynne)
January 17, 2017 Notice to Counsel regarding: #10 Notice of Change of Address, #11 Notice of Change of Address. Counsel is reminded that in addition to filing a notice of change of address with the court, an attorney whose email address, mailing address, telephone or fax number has changed from that of the original online attorney registration form shall edit his or her account information also in CM/ECF. (Briggeman, N.)
November 28, 2016 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance filed by Peter D. Siddoway on behalf of Valencell, Inc.. (Siddoway, Peter)
November 16, 2016 Filing 8 REASSIGNMENT ORDER - At the direction of the court, and for the continued efficient administration of justice, the above-captioned case is reassigned to the Honorable James C. Dever III, Chief United States District Judge, for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:16-CV-895-D. Signed by Julie Richards Johnston, Clerk of Court on 11/16/2016. (Baker, C.)
November 15, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Bragi Store, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Baker, C.)
November 14, 2016 Filing 6 PATENT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Director of the United States Patent and Trademark Office located at Post Office Box 1450, Alexandria, Virginia, 22313-1450 via US Mail on November 14, 2016. (Campbell, J.)
November 14, 2016 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
November 11, 2016 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Lynne A. Borchers on behalf of Valencell, Inc. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 11, 2016 Filing 4 Financial Disclosure Statement by Valencell, Inc (Borchers, Lynne)
November 11, 2016 Filing 3 Notice filed by Valencell, Inc. - Bragi Store, LLC Proposed Summons. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 11, 2016 Filing 2 Notice filed by Valencell, Inc. - Civil Cover Sheet. (Borchers, Lynne)
November 11, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0417-3891498) filed by Valencell, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 8,923,941, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 8,647,270, #3 Exhibit C - U.S. Patent No. 8,934,952, #4 Exhibit D - U.S. Patent No. 8,929,965) (Borchers, Lynne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valencell, Inc v. Bragi Store, LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bragi Store, LLC
Represented By: William C. Bergmann
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bragi North America, LLC
Represented By: William C. Bergmann
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bragi GmbH
Represented By: William C. Bergmann
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr.
Represented By: Kelly Margolis Dagger
Represented By: Paul K. Sun, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valencell, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter defendant: Valencell, Inc.
Represented By: Peter D. Siddoway
Represented By: Jonathan H. Rastegar
Represented By: Brian P. Herrmann
Represented By: Patrick J. Conroy
Represented By: Lynne A. Borchers
Represented By: Jeffrey R. Bragalone
Represented By: Gavin B. Parsons
Represented By: William Gabriel Pagan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?