ABL & Associates Plumbing, LLC v. United States of America
Plaintiff: ABL & Associates Plumbing, LLC
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 5:2016cv00918
Filed: November 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS defendant'smotion for summary judgment [D.E. 25]. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/21/2019. (Sellers, N.)
December 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting 37 Motion to Stay. This case is stayed pending the restoration of appropriations; and All deadlines in this case shall be extended by the duration of the lapse in appropriations. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 12/28/2018. (Sellers, N.)
June 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting 20 Motion to Stay. This Matter is Stayed for a period of60 days until August 11, 2018. Upon August 11, 2018, unless already adjudicated, parties will submit a Status Update to the Court, and that if the case continues, the court upon hearing from the parties will issue an amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 6/13/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
July 25, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting 9 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Count III of the Complaint is DISMISSED. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/25/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABL & Associates Plumbing, LLC v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ABL & Associates Plumbing, LLC
Represented By: Todd Allen Jones
Represented By: Sarah Kristin Thacker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?