Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW00017013 v. American Realty Advisors, et al

Plaintiff: Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW00017013
Defendant: American Realty Advisors, SVF Weston Lakeside, LLC and DOES 1-25
Counter_claimant: SVF Weston Lakeside, LLC and American Realty Advisors
Counter_defendant: Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW00017013
Case Number: 5:2016cv00940
Filed: December 9, 2016
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Order - The court has been advised that the parties have settled all matters in controversy among them. Therefore, the above matters are DISMISSED subject to the right of any party to file a motion to reopen the cases should settlement not be consummated within 45 days hereof. The parties are directed to file their Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice on or before December 16, 2018. As there appears to be no further reason at this time to maintain the files as open ones for statistical purposes, the cases are removed from the active docket. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/1/2018. (Collins, S.)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER granting 163 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/16/2018. (Collins, S.)
September 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying 100 Motion to Compel from American Realty Advisors ; denying 101 Motion to Compel DISCOVERY FROM SVF WESTON LAKESIDE, LLC. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical information. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/30/2018. (Collins, S.)
September 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying 97 Motion to Compel ARA Parties' Motion to Compel and for Award of Expenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/29/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER granting 155 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO EXCUSE LOCAL COUNSEL FROM ATTENDANCE AT DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 8/22/2018. (Collins, S.)
February 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER granting 114 Motion to Compel. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/14/2018. (Collins, S.)
November 15, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 86 Motion for Discovery, granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Amend Case Management Order - The court CLARIFIES that the limitation of ten depositions per side se t forth in the case management order, (DE 37), includes depositions of both expert and non-expert witnesses. The court ORDERS that plaintiff is allowed three depositions in addition to the ten depositions authorized by the case management order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/15/2017. (Tripp, S.)
November 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER - Defendants motion, 47 , is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The substantive law of California shall govern adjudication of all claims. Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262P20017013/Certai n Underwriters at Lloyds of London shall continue to be designated as plaintiff and American Realty Advisors, SVF Weston Lakeside, LLC, and Does 115, inclusive, shall continue to be designated as defendants. Plaintiffs motion, 49 , is DENIED. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 11/9/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 65 Motion to Compel. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/25/2017. (Collins, S.)
September 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER - Defendants' motion to hold the motion to compel in abeyance is ALLOWED. The court will defer ruling on the motion to compel pending a telephonic discovery dispute conference on the motion. The court will hold a t elephonic discovery dispute conference on defendants' motion to compel on Wednesday, 20 September 2017, at 3:00 p.m. This conference will be combined with a hearing on defendants' motion for a protective order. Counsel shall therefore be pr epared to address both the motion to compel and the motion for a protective order. Counsel shall contact Deputy Clerk Bobbie Horton no later than noon on Monday, 18 September 2017, at (919) 645-1774 to provide a telephone number at which each can be reached. If any issues presented by defendants' motion to compel remain in dispute following the discovery dispute conference, plaintiffs shall have until 27 September 2017 to file any response. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 9/14/2017. (Collins, S.)
April 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 25 Motion to Consolidate Cases. This case is hereby consolidated with 5:17-CV-74-FL. Unless good cause be shown, all future filings shall be docketed in this master file. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/10/2017. (Edwards, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW00017013 v. American Realty Advisors, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW00017013
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Realty Advisors
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SVF Weston Lakeside, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: SVF Weston Lakeside, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_claimant: American Realty Advisors
Represented By: Joseph Samuel Dowdy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Certain Interested Underwriters Subscribing to Policy No. B1262PW00017013
Represented By: Kevin Michael O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?