United States of America v. Salmon
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tanisha Salmon
Case Number: 5:2017cv00016
Filed: January 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 38 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/10/2018. (Collins, S.)
February 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting 25 Motion for Entry of Default against Raeford Lewis. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 2/5/2018. (Collins, S.)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Compel. Within 14 days, the Defendant shall serve on counsel for the United States a formal written response to the United States requests for production of documents. Further, within 14 days, the Defendant shall produce to the United States, or make available for inspection and copying, the documents in the Defendants possession, custody, or control that are responsive to the United States requests for production of documents. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 8/16/2017. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tanisha Salmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel A. Applegate
Represented By: Joshua Y. Levine
Represented By: Jared S. Wiesner
Represented By: Alison A. Yewdell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?