Berger, et al v. The United States Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Plaintiff: Phil Berger and Tim Moore
Defendant: The United States Department of Health and Human Services, The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services, Renard Murray, The North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services, Norris Cochran, Patrick Conway and Mandy Cohen
Case Number: 5:2017cv00025
Filed: January 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER - Defendants' emergency motions to vacate or dissolve the temporary restraining order are denied as moot. A stay of the case is in effect subject to the terms, conditions, and deadlines of the attached order. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/27/2017. (Baker, C.)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting 31 Consent MOTION on Page Limits regarding Text Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/24/2017. (Baker, C.)
January 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting 6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/14/2017. (Baker, C.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berger, et al v. The United States Department of Health and Human Services, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phil Berger
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: William C. Marra
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Haley N. Proctor
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tim Moore
Represented By: Nathan Andrew Huff
Represented By: Michael W. Kirk
Represented By: William C. Marra
Represented By: Nicole Jo Moss
Represented By: Haley N. Proctor
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renard Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North Carolina Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Michael Strauss Kolber
Represented By: James Dickson Phillips, III
Represented By: John R. Wester
Represented By: David C. Wright, III
Represented By: Erik R. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norris Cochran
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Conway
Represented By: James O. Bickford
Represented By: Joel L. McElvain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandy Cohen
Represented By: Adam Karl Doerr
Represented By: Michael Strauss Kolber
Represented By: James Dickson Phillips, III
Represented By: John R. Wester
Represented By: David C. Wright, III
Represented By: Erik R. Zimmerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?