Barfield Montoya v. Berryhill
Plaintiff: Carol Barfield Montoya
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Case Number: 5:2017cv00094
Filed: February 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAYNE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Supplemental Security Income
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Commissioner of Social Security pay to Plaintiff's counsel, the sum of $4,568.50 from Plaintiff's back benefits and upon the payment of such sum this case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 11/16/2018. (Sellers, N.)
January 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Defendant pay Plaintiff Five Hundred Sixty-Eight dollars and Fifty cents ($568.50) in attorney's fees, in full satisfaction of any and all claims arising under the Equal A ccess to Justice Act, 28 U.S.C. § 2412. The fee award will first be subject to offset of any debt Plaintiff may owe to the United States. If such a debt exists, the debt will be satisfied first, and if any funds remain, they will be made payable to Plaintiff and mailed to Plaintiff's attorney. If Plaintiff does not owe a federal debt, the Commissioner will honor the agreement between Plaintiff and her attorney, and the fees will be made payable to anddelivered to Plaintiff's attorney. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/23/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
September 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the Court hereby reverses theCommissioner's decision under sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g) and remands the case to the Commissioner for further proceedings, including a new hearing. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/21/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barfield Montoya v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Barfield Montoya
Represented By: Derrick Kyle Arrowood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?