Monterossa Salguero v. Franco Argueta
Petitioner: Jose Gustavo Monterossa Salguero
Respondent: Madonna Alexandra Marce Franco Argueta
Case Number: 5:2017cv00125
Filed: March 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:11607
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 10/6/2017. (Collins, S.)
June 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER granting 105 Joint Motion to Unseal Document 83 SEALED Transcript, 84 SEALED Transcript, 82 SEALED Transcript, 89 SEALED Order - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/23/2017. (Tripp, S.)
June 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER denying 96 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/21/2017. (Edwards, S.)
June 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 JUDGMENT - Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/16/2017. (Tripp, S.)
June 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER granting 75 Motion to Seal Document 74 PROPOSED SEALED Reply - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 6/14/2017. (Tripp, S.)
May 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting 78 Motion to Seal Document 61 SEALED Transcript, 60 SEALED Transcript, 62 SEALED Transcript - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/22/2017. (Tripp, S.)
April 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoenas for the Production of Documents on Non-Parties. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 4/6/2017. (Edwards, S.)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 38 EXTENDED TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER - Respondent is ORDERED to file with the Clerk of Court any and all of the child's travel documents, including her passport and American visa. The Clerk of Court shall hold the trave l documents pending further order of this Court. This Order shall expire on the date that the Court enters a final decision on the merits of Petitioner's First Amended Verified Petition, (DE 17), and Petitioner's bond shall be released to Petitioner at that time, unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/31/2017. (Baker, C.)
March 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting 32 Expedited Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena for Production of Documents on Non-Party - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/24/2017. (Tripp, S.)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting 30 Expedited Motion for Petitioner and Other Foreign Witnesses to Testify Remotely - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/23/2017. (Baker, C.)
March 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting 18 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (Ex Parte and Expedited) - Respondent and those acting at her direction are hereby ENJOINED from removing the child from the Eastern District of North Carolina pending resolution of petitioner's amended Hague petition. Petitioner is DIRECTED immediately to pay to the court a bond, in the amount of $500.00. The court NOTICES hearing on March 28, 2017, to begin at 10:00 at the United States Court house in New Bern, North Carolina. Respondent is ORDERED to bring the child, as well as any and all of the child's travel documents, including her passport and America visa, to the hearing. This TRO shall expire 14 days from date of entry, unless extended within that time on motion by petitioner, for good cause shown or with consent of respondent. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/21/2017. (Tripp, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Monterossa Salguero v. Franco Argueta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Gustavo Monterossa Salguero
Represented By: Matthew A. Abee
Represented By: Reed J. Hollander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Madonna Alexandra Marce Franco Argueta
Represented By: Terry Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?