Wells v. Fifth Third Bank, Inc.
Plaintiff: Wells and Keri Wells
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, Inc.
Case Number: 5:2017cv00178
Filed: April 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - On August 7, 2020, defendant plaintiff filed a joint status report [D. E. 22]. The joint status report states that the parties have resolved their dispute, there are no further issue to be adjudicated, and request that the case be closed. See id. Accordingly, the clerk is DIRECTED to close the case. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 9/4/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 12, 2020 Remark - #22 Status Report submitted to US District Judge James C. Dever. (Stouch, L.)
August 7, 2020 Filing 22 STATUS REPORT (Joint) by Fifth Third Bank, Inc. (Kutrow, Bradley)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER - Not later than August 14, 2020, the parties shall file a joint statement updating the court on the status of this case. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 8/6/2020. (Stouch, L.)
August 16, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #13 Motion to Compel arbitration and to stay proceedings. The court STAYS the action pending arbitration of plaintiff's claims. The parties shall notify this court upon the conclusion of the arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/16/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
July 18, 2017 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings. (Briggeman, N.)
July 12, 2017 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Kutrow, Bradley)
July 12, 2017 Filing 18 Declaration regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Fifth Third Bank, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Wells Account Statements) (Kutrow, Bradley)
July 12, 2017 Filing 17 Declaration regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings by Fifth Third Bank, Inc. (Kutrow, Bradley)
June 28, 2017 Filing 16 RESPONSE to Motion regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Keri Wells. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration of Keri Wells, #2 Exhibit Unpublished Case - MCI Communications, #3 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Manguiat, #4 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Hinten, #5 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Al Maya, #6 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Goodwin, #7 Exhibit Unpublished Case - Overseas Oil, #8 Exhibit Unpublished Case - BS Sun Shipping) (Merritt, Keith)
June 7, 2017 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Kutrow, Bradley)
June 7, 2017 Filing 14 Declaration regarding #13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings of Angela Howell by Fifth Third Bank, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Fifth Third Identity Alert Premium Membership Enrollment Form, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2015 Fifth Third Identity Alert Membership Terms and Conditions, #3 Exhibit 3 - 2016 Fifth Third Identity Alert Membership Terms & Conditions) (Kutrow, Bradley)
June 7, 2017 Filing 13 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Proceedings filed by Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Kutrow, Bradley)
May 18, 2017 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Locke Beatty on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Beatty, Robert)
May 18, 2017 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance filed by Bradley R. Kutrow on behalf of Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Kutrow, Bradley)
May 17, 2017 Filing 10 Affidavit of Service for Summons & Complaint filed by Keri Wells served on Fifth Third Bank, Inc. on April 26, 2017. (Merritt, Keith)
May 17, 2017 Notice to Counsel regarding: #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer. Each attorney should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Briggeman, N.)
May 17, 2017 TEXT ORDER granting the consent motion for extension of time #8 filed by defendant Fifth Third Bank, Inc. Defendant shall have through and including June 7, 2017 to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint #1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/17/2017. (Hockaday, A.)
May 16, 2017 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by Fifth Third Bank, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Fifth Third Bancorp for Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Kutrow, Bradley)
May 16, 2017 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint filed by Fifth Third Bank, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Kutrow, Bradley)
May 16, 2017 Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Complaint. (Briggeman, N.)
April 18, 2017 Filing 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Keith J. Merritt on behalf of Keri Wells. (Merritt, Keith)
April 17, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Fifth Third Bank, Inc. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Briggeman, N.)
April 17, 2017 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
April 17, 2017 NOTICE TO COUNSEL - All counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). Additionally, counsel is reminded that all future filings must conform to this court's policies which require reflection of the case number on all documents filed in this action and that all pages must be properly oriented. (Campbell, J.)
April 13, 2017 Filing 5 Civil coversheet by Keri Wells. Amendment to #1 Complaint Coversheet (Merritt, Keith) Modified on 4/14/2017 - clarified docket text. (Briggeman, N.)
April 13, 2017 Filing 4 Proposed Summons by Keri Wells. Amendment to #1 Complaint Summons to Fifth Third Bank (Merritt, Keith) Modified on 4/14/2017 - clarified docket text. (Briggeman, N.)
April 13, 2017 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Keri Wells. Amendment to #1 Complaint Summons to Fifth Third Bank (Merritt, Keith) Modified on 4/14/2017 -clarified docket text. (Briggeman, N.)
April 13, 2017 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Keri Wells (Merritt, Keith)
April 13, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Fifth Third Bank, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4055981.), filed by Keri Wells. (Attachments: #1 Account Agreement, #2 Identity Alert) (Merritt, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells v. Fifth Third Bank, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keri Wells
Represented By: Keith J. Merritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank, Inc.
Represented By: Robert Locke Beatty
Represented By: Bradley R. Kutrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?