Heineken Brouwerijen B.V. et al v. Bright Neon Signs
Plaintiff: Heineken Brouwerijen B.V., Heineken USA Inc. and Cervezas Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma, S.A. DE C.V.
Defendant: Bright Neon Signs
Case Number: 5:2017cv00249
Filed: May 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: xxU.S. Outside District
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 JUDGMENT on Attorney Fees. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the court GRANTS plaintiffs' motion [D.E. 16] and AWARDS to plaintiffs attorney's fees in the amount of $40,991.25 and costs in the amount of $1,926.09. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/19/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
November 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Cervezas Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma, S.A. DE C.V., Heineken Brouwerijen B.V., Heineken USA Inc. against Bright Neon Signs. Pursuant to 15 U.S.C. § 1117(a) and N.C. Gen. Stat. §75-16.1(1), plaintiffs are awarded attorney's fees and costs in an amount to be proven. Plaintiffs shall submit appropriate documentation supporting their request for fees and costs by December 20, 2017. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/28/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
July 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting 8 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/24/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heineken Brouwerijen B.V. et al v. Bright Neon Signs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heineken Brouwerijen B.V.
Represented By: Jennifer Butler Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heineken USA Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Butler Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cervezas Cuauhtemoc Moctezuma, S.A. DE C.V.
Represented By: Jennifer Butler Routh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright Neon Signs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?