Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Oak City Contracting, LLC
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Oak City Contracting, LLC
Case Number: 5:2017cv00258
Filed: May 26, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2018 Filing 30 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Chollet, Albert)
December 20, 2017 Filing 29 NOTICE of Settlement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Chollet, Albert)
November 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Stay. All discovery, motions, deadlines and pleadings in this action shall be stayed and held in abeyance from November 22, 2017, until December 22, 2017, including but not limited to the Motion to Amend [ECF 22, 23] and the Motion to Compel [ECF 24, 25], while Liberty Mutual and Oak City pursue a mediated settlement. If Liberty Mutual and Oak City fail to notify the Court that they have reached a mediated settlement on or by December 21, 2017, then this limited stay of discovery proceedings shall automatically terminate on December 22, 2017. Oak City's time to respond to Liberty's Motion to Amend [ECF 22, 23] and Liberty's Motion to Compel [ECF 24, 25] is extended to January 8, 2018. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 11/22/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
November 22, 2017 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #26 Joint MOTION to Stay regarding #22 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #18 Scheduling Order, #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Discovery, #25 Memorandum in Support, #27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #18 Scheduling Order, #24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Discovery. (Briggeman, N.)
November 22, 2017 Filing 27 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #22 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #18 Scheduling Order, , #24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Discovery filed by Oak City Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Wolf, William)
November 22, 2017 Filing 26 Joint MOTION to Stay regarding #22 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #18 Scheduling Order, , #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Discovery, #25 Memorandum in Support, #18 Scheduling Order, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Chollet, Albert)
November 17, 2017 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support regarding #24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Discovery filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Oak City Answers to Interrogatories, #2 Exhibit B - Oak City Response to Production of Documents, #3 Exhibit C - Discovery Demand) (Davis, Paul)
November 17, 2017 Filing 24 MOTION to Compel Compliance with Discovery filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Davis, Paul)
November 15, 2017 Filing 23 Supplement to #22 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #18 Scheduling Order filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Chollet, Albert) Modified on 11/15/2017 - terminated motion and changed docket text to indicate that this is a supplement to #22 Motion rather than a motion itself. (Briggeman, N.)
November 13, 2017 Filing 22 MOTION to Amend/Correct #17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint), #18 Scheduling Order, filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Chollet, Albert)
October 30, 2017 Filing 21 STIPULATION AND CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II on 10/30/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
October 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Oak City Contracting, LLC. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 10/30/2017. Motion referred to US Magistrate Judge Robert T. Numbers, II. (Briggeman, N.)
October 19, 2017 Motion Submitted to Chief Judge James C. Dever III: regarding #19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order. (Briggeman, N.)
October 18, 2017 Filing 19 Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Oak City Contracting, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Stipulation & Consent Protective Order) (Wolf, William)
August 14, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 3/30/2018. Motions due by 5/4/2018. Counsel should read the order in its entirety for critical deadlines and information. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 8/14/2017. (Attachments: #1 Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Form) (Briggeman, N.)
August 8, 2017 Filing 17 Rule 26(f) Report (joint) filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Chollet, Albert)
August 2, 2017 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance for non-district by John Edward Sebastian on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Sebastian, John)
June 29, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 6/29/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
June 28, 2017 Filing 14 Financial Disclosure Statement by Oak City Contracting, LLC identifying Corporate Parent CCJ, LLC for Oak City Contracting, LLC. (Wolf, William)
June 28, 2017 Filing 13 Notice of Appearance filed by William J. Wolf on behalf of Oak City Contracting, LLC. (Wolf, William)
June 28, 2017 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Oak City Contracting, LLC. (Wolf, William)
June 12, 2017 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
June 8, 2017 Filing 11 Affidavit of Service for Summons and Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company served on Agent for Oak City Contracting LLC on June 7, 2017. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Domestic Return Receipt) (Davis, Paul)
May 31, 2017 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Erica Marie Del Aguila on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Del Aguila, Erica)
May 31, 2017 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance for non-district by Albert Louis Chollet on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Chollet, Albert)
May 31, 2017 Notice to Counsel regarding: #7 Notice of Appearance, #8 Notice of Appearance. When out-of-district counsel files notices of appearance or any other document, all documents must be signed by local counsel in addition to being signed by the filer. See Local Rule 83.1(d), "Litigants in civil actions, except governmental agencies and parties appearing pro se, must be represented by at least one member of the bar of this court who shall sign all documents filed in this court, including his or her state bar number and fax number in the signature block on all pleadings." Please re-file these Notices with Local Counsel's signature. (Briggeman, N.)
May 30, 2017 Filing 8 DISREGARD. Re-filed at #10 . Notice of Appearance filed by Erica Marie Del Aguila on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Del Aguila, Erica) Modified on 5/31/2017 (Briggeman, N.).
May 30, 2017 Filing 7 DISREGARD. Re-filed at #9 . Notice of Appearance filed by Albert Louis Chollet on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Chollet, Albert) Modified on 5/31/2017 (Briggeman, N.).
May 30, 2017 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Oak City Contracting, LLC. Counsel is reminded to print summons and effect service. (Briggeman, N.)
May 30, 2017 Notice to Counsel regarding: #1 Complaint. Counsel is reminded that all future filings must conform to this court's policies which require that all documents filed in this action be in a text searchable format pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.1. In addition, for future reference, the proposed summons and Civil Cover Sheet should be filed as attachments to the Complaint. (Briggeman, N.)
May 30, 2017 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding: #1 Complaint. Pursuant to Section V(E)(e) of the CM/ECF Policy Manual, attachments and exhibits must be identified with a clear and complete description in the docket entry text (e.g. 'Exhibit 1' is insufficient. 'Exhibit 1 - Map of Main Street' would meet the requirement.). Further, when filing a document with more than five (5) attachments, the first attached document must be an index of all subsequently attached documents. The clerk's office has corrected the deficiency in this instance, but future filings must adhere to the court's filing policy. (Briggeman, N.)
May 26, 2017 Filing 5 Financial Disclosure Statement by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Davis, Paul)
May 26, 2017 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Paul E. Davis on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Davis, Paul)
May 26, 2017 Filing 3 Notice Civil Cover Sheet filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint. (Davis, Paul) Modified on 5/30/2017 - added document description. (Briggeman, N.)
May 26, 2017 Filing 2 Notice, Proposed Summons filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company regarding #1 Complaint. (Davis, Paul) Modified on 5/30/2017 - added document description. (Briggeman, N.)
May 26, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Oak City Contracting, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4105342.), filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email correspondence from Dick Crittenden to Paul Hurley, #2 Exhibit B - Email correspondence between Mr. Crittenden and Sara Escareno, #3 Exhibit C - Bill of Sale, #4 Exhibit D - Automobile/Trailer Lease Agreement, #5 Exhibit E - Email correspondence between Thomas Guy and Matthew Campbell, #6 Exhibit F - Email Correspondence between Paul Hurley and Thomas Guy, #7 Exhibit G - Email correspondence between Paul Hurley and Thomas Guy) (Davis, Paul) Modified on 5/30/2017 - added exhibit descriptions in docket text. (Briggeman, N.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company v. Oak City Contracting, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oak City Contracting, LLC
Represented By: William J. Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Paul E. Davis
Represented By: Erica Marie Del Aguila
Represented By: Albert Louis Chollet
Represented By: John Edward Sebastian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?