Carroll v. Oakley Trucking, Inc., et al
Plaintiff: |
Wendy G. Carroll |
Defendant: |
Oakley Trucking, Inc. and Thad Austin Pittman |
Case Number: |
5:2017cv00357 |
Filed: |
July 17, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina |
Office: |
Western Division Office |
County: |
WAYNE |
Presiding Judge: |
W. Earl Britt |
Nature of Suit: |
Motor Vehicle |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 1441 |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
December 13, 2019 |
Filing
89
ORDER regarding 84 Motion to Approve Settlement. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 12/13/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
|
February 11, 2019 |
Filing
66
ORDER granting 63 Motion - Request for Approval of Appeal Bond. The appeal bond (DE # 63-1) is approved. Defendants are DIRECTED to submit the original bond to the clerk within ten (10) days. Execution of the amended judgment entered on 3 January 2019 (DE # 61) is STAYED pending disposition of the appeal to the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 2/11/2019. (Edwards, S.)
|
January 3, 2019 |
Filing
61
AMENDED JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Oakley is liable for defendant Pittman's negligence. Carroll was not contributorily negligent in the operation of his motorcycle. The Estate of Thomas Anthony Carroll have and recover from Thad Pittman and Oakley Trucking, Inc., jointly and severally, the amount of $1,551,767 along with prejudgment interest as allowed by North Carolina law at the legal North Carolina rate of 8% from 12 June 2017, the date this action was instituted by plaintiff, to 10 December 2018, the date this order was entered. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 1/3/2019. (Herrmann, L.)
|
December 10, 2018 |
Filing
53
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that Oakley is liable for defendant Pittman's negligence. Carroll was not contributorily negligent in the operation of his motorcycle. The Estate of Tony Carroll have and recover from Thad Pittman and Oakley Trucking, Inc., jointly and severally, the amount of $1,551,767. Signed by Susan K. Edwards, Deputy for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/10/2018. (Edwards, S.)
|
November 13, 2017 |
Filing
21
CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER - Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr on 11/13/2017. (Briggeman, N.)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?