Gaspar v. McCament, et al
Plaintiff: Pascual Luciano Tomas Gaspar
Defendant: James McCament, Elaine Duke and Robert M. Cowan
Case Number: 5:2017cv00459
Filed: September 10, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 11/8/2018. This action is hereby TRANSFERRED in its entirety to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. (Stouch, L.)
June 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot 11 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 6/26/2018. (Stouch, L.)
April 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting 13 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff's 8 Motion for Default Judgment is withdrawn. Plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to properly serve the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Eastern District of North Carolina. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 4/8/2018. (Stouch, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gaspar v. McCament, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pascual Luciano Tomas Gaspar
Represented By: John D. Mansfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James McCament
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elaine Duke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert M. Cowan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?