Epic Games, Inc. v. Rogers Featured Case
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Defendant: Caleb Rogers
Case Number: 5:2017cv00534
Filed: October 23, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Malcolm J. Howard
Nature of Suit: Copyrights
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2017 Filing 6 Letter from Lauren A. Rogers (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1- Copy of summons, # 2 Attachment 2- Copy of page 1 of complaint, # 3 Envelope) (Rudd, D.)
November 6, 2017 Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Horton, B.)
October 27, 2017 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Caleb Rogers. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.)
October 27, 2017 Filing 4 COPYRIGHT REPORT: Copy of report and complaint forwarded to the Register of Copyrights located at the Copyright Office, Library of Congress, Washington, DC 20559 via US Mail on 10/27/2017. (Rudd, D.)
October 23, 2017 Filing 3 Financial Disclosure Statement by Epic Games, Inc. (Thomas, Christopher)
October 23, 2017 Filing 2 Notice of Appearance filed by Christopher M. Thomas on behalf of Epic Games, Inc.. (Thomas, Christopher)
October 23, 2017 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Caleb Rogers ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4271232.), filed by Epic Games, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons) (Thomas, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Epic Games, Inc. v. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Epic Games, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher M. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caleb Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?