McNeill v. Fayetteville State University
Plaintiff: Flecherlene McNeill
Defendant: Fayetteville State University
Case Number: 5:2017cv00609
Filed: December 11, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: W. Earl Britt
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 30 CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 10/15/2018. (Herrmann, L.)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER adopting 19 Memorandum and Recommendations and granting in part and denying in part 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Plaintiff's ADA and FMLA claims will be allowed to proceed. Plaintiff cannot recover punitive damages of defendant. Signed by Senior Judge W. Earl Britt on 9/12/2018. (Stouch, L.)
May 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Discovery pending the court's disposition of Defendant's motion to dismiss. The parties' deadline to make initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1) and to confer pursuant to Rule 26(f) is hereby extended for a period of fourteen (14) days following the court's disposition of Defendant's pending motion to dismiss. The parties shall file their proposed discovery plan with the court within fourteen (14) days following the Rule 26(f) conference. Signed by United States Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Swank on 5/24/2018. (Edwards, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McNeill v. Fayetteville State University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayetteville State University
Represented By: Catherine Faith Jordan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Flecherlene McNeill
Represented By: Wilson F. Fong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?