Harris v. City of Raleigh et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Ray Harris
Defendant: City of Raleigh, County of Wake and Donnie Harrison
Case Number: 5:2018ct03200
Filed: August 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2018 Filing 6 Letter from Anthony Ray Harris regarding imminent danger. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
August 28, 2018 Filing 5 Letter from plaintiff regarding imminent danger. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
August 15, 2018 Case Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan for frivolity review. As soon as the screening is concluded, an order will issue and the next appropriate step will be taken. (Castania, M)
August 15, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees. (Castania, M)
August 14, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees filed by Anthony Ray Harris. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER regarding deficiency. You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Response due by 8/28/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 8/7/2018. Copy served via US Mail, along with form application: Anthony Ray Harris 290149, Wake County Jail, P.O. Box 2419, Raleigh, NC 27602. (Castania, M)
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Anthony Ray Harris at Wake County Jail. (Indig, A.)
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Raleigh, County of Wake and Donnie Harrison filed by Anthony Ray Harris. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harris v. City of Raleigh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Raleigh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Wake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donnie Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ray Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?