McLean v. Ammons et al
Plaintiff: Habimana Lisimba McLean
Defendant: Officer T. Smith, Judge Thomas D. Haigwood, J.M. Ray, Cumberland County Courthouse, Judge James Floyd Ammons, Jr., D.P. Bloomfield, Officer Jason Beldon, Fayetteville Police Department, Eric A. Hooks, Rita Cox and Officer V. Chavez
Case Number: 5:2018ct03288
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 12/10/2018. Copy served via US Mail: Habimana Lisimba McLean 0762435, Bertie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 129, Windsor, NC 27983. (Castania, M)
November 27, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan: #6 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal. (Castania, M)
November 26, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal filed by Habimana Lisimba McLean. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Castania, M)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Fact/Truth filed by Habimana Lisimba McLean. (Attachment: #1 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
October 29, 2018 Filing 4 Documents as Evidence in Support of Claims filed by Habimana Lisimba McLean. (Attachments: #1 Documents in Support, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)
October 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF DEFICIENCY - You must either file an application to proceed without prepayment of fees and affidavit or pay $400.00. Correction due by 11/16/2018. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Robert B. Jones, Jr. on 10/26/2018. Copy served via US Mail, along with form application: Habimana Lisimba McLean 0762435, Bertie Correctional Institution, P.O. Box 129, Windsor, NC 27983. (Castania, M)
October 19, 2018 Filing 2 Letter regarding case opening sent via US Mail to Habimana Lisimba McLean at Bertie Correctional Institution. (Indig, A.)
October 19, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against James Floyd Ammons, Jr, Jason Beldon, D.P. Bloomfield, V. Chavez, Rita Cox, Cumberland County Courthouse, Fayetteville Police Department, Thomas D. Haigwood, Eric A. Hooks, J.M. Ray and T. Smith filed by Habimana Lisimba McLean. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Envelope) (Indig, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McLean v. Ammons et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer T. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Thomas D. Haigwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.M. Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cumberland County Courthouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge James Floyd Ammons, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.P. Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Jason Beldon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fayetteville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric A. Hooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rita Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer V. Chavez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Habimana Lisimba McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?