Richardson v. Roberts et al
Plaintiff: Hilda Richardson
Defendant: Vickie Roberts, Dan Fowell, Kristen Bierline, NC Department of State Treasurer and Josephine Stith
Case Number: 5:2018cv00018
Filed: January 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered May 8, 2019, and for the reasons set forth more specifically therein, the court GRANTS defendant Bierline's motion to dismis s and remaining defendants' motion to dismiss, dismissing with prejudice plaintiff's claim against defendant Fowell and dismissing without prejudice plaintiff's claim against remaining defendants arising under the ADA. IT IS FURTHER OR DERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED in accordance with the court's order entered May 8, 2019 that by plaintiff's failure to timely file amended complaint as allowed by order of the court entered May 8, 2019, the court dismisses the complaint with prejudice. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/30/2019. (Collins, S.)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting 45 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 47 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 51 Motion to Seal 49 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit #2; grant ing 53 Motion to Strike 49 Affidavit in Opposition to Motion. Because the deficiencies in plaintiff's complaint may be curable by amendment, the court grants plaintiff leave to file an amended complaint within 21 days of the date of this order. If plaintiff seeks to amend in this manner, plaintiff shall also file notice clarifying if plaintiff proceeds pro se or with counsel. If plaintiff elects to proceed pro se, counsel must file motion to withdraw from this case. In the event no a mended complaint is timely filed, the clerk is DIRECTED to enter final judgment closing this case, and dismissing the complaint with prejudice, based upon the decision herein. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 5/8/2019. (Collins, S.)
January 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Dismiss, granting 30 Motion for Extension of Time for Service, and denying 38 Motion to Dismiss - The court allows plaintiff until January 31, 2019 to effect and prove service on the docket regarding this cause of action. No further motions for extension of time for service made by plaintiff will be granted. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 1/7/2019. (Tripp, S.)
March 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 4 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying 1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The DIRECTS plaintiff to pay the requisite court costs, including the filing fee on or before April 5, 2018. If plaintiff fails to pay the filing fee by that date, the clerk shall re-designate the action as a miscellaneous case and close the matter without further order from the court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 3/5/2018. (Collins, S.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Roberts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilda Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vickie Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dan Fowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristen Bierline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of State Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josephine Stith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?