Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Building Blocks Pediatrics, PLLC et al
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Defendant: Building Blocks Pediatrics, PLLC, Dori J. Thomas, Michael Thomas, Kristi Woods Edwards and Clyde Edwards
Case Number: 5:2018cv00024
Filed: January 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: James C. Dever
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting 72 Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Plaintiffs attorneys' fees in the amount of $117,425.53 and costs in the amount of $1,774.82 are hereby taxed against Defendants Dori J. Thomas and Michael Thomas. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 7/10/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 JUDGMENT - The court GRANTS Wells Fargo's motion for summary judgment against Michael Thomas [D.E. 62]. The court also ENTERS judgment against Dori Thomas. Michael Thomas and Dori Thomas owe Wells Fargo $782,836.88, interest, attorneys' ; fees, and costs in accordance with the note and guaranties. Wells Fargo may submit a motion for costs in accordance with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and this court's local rules. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/26/2020. (Sellers, N.)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting 58 Motion to Stay. If the parties are unable to resolve the case within the period of the stay, proceedings shall commence on July 1, 2019, and the parties shall have until July 16, 2019 to complete discovery and until July 31, 2019 to file dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 5/30/2019. (Sellers, N.)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting 56 Motion to Stay. If the parties are unable to resolve the case within the period of the stay, proceedings shall commence on May 15, 2019, and the parties shall have until June 1, 2019 to complete discovery and until June 15, 2019 to file dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 4/15/2019. (Sellers, N.)
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting 54 Motion to Stay. If the parties are unable to resolve the case within the period of the stay, proceedings shall commence on April 1, 2019, and the parties shall have until April 20, 2019 to complete discovery and until May 15, 2019 to file dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 2/13/2019. (Sellers, N.)
January 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting 52 Motion to Stay. If the parties are unable to resolve the case within the period of the stay, proceedings shall commence on February 13, 2019, and the parties shall have until March 4, 2019 to complete discovery and until April1, 2019 to file dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever, III on 1/15/2019. (Stouch, L.)
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER granting 50 Motion to Stay. If the parties are unable to resolve the case within the period of the stay, proceedings shall commence on December 29, 2018, the parties shall have until January 18, 2019, to complete discovery and until February 15, 2019, to file dispositive motions. Signed by District Judge James C. Dever III on 11/20/2018. (Sellers, N.)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 42 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER (As Modified) - Signed by US Magistrate Judge James E. Gates on 7/25/2018. (Sellers, N.)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 40 CONSENT JUDGMENT in favor of Wells Fargo Bank, National Association against Building Blocks Pediatrics, PLLC. The entry of this Consent Judgment shall not in any manner prejudice Wells Fargo's remaining claims for relief against the non-consenting defendants or remaining claims for relief, if any, non-consenting defendants may have against Wells Fargo. Signed by Chief Judge James C. Dever III on 7/19/2018. (Briggeman, N.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association v. Building Blocks Pediatrics, PLLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, National Association
Represented By: Matthew Patrick Weiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Building Blocks Pediatrics, PLLC
Represented By: Jason L. Hendren
Represented By: Rebecca F. Redwine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dori J. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Thomas
Represented By: Matthew W. Buckmiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Woods Edwards
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clyde Edwards
Represented By: Travis Philip Sasser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?