Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.13 Acre, More or Less, in Cumberland County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0474-88-1723 Identified in Book 9573, Page 684, Instrument No. 00505, and Owned by Soon J. Chun et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 0.13 Acre, More or Less, in Cumberland County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0474-88-1723 Identified in Book 9573, Page 684, Instrument No. 00505, and Owned by Soon J. Chun and Soon J. Chun
Case Number: 5:2018cv00042
Filed: January 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: CUMBERLAND
Presiding Judge: Terrence W. Boyle
Nature of Suit: Land Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 717
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER STAYING CASE - Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to provide a status update as to this action. The stay will be lifted by order of the Court at the appropriate time. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/14/2022. (Stouch, L.)
August 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER STAYING CASE - Plaintiff is directed to file a status report not later than December 1, 2021, and to provide additional status updates as needed every sixty (60) days thereafter. Plaintiff shall further notify the Court within ten (10) days of FERC's entry of an order amending plaintiff's Certificate of Public Necessity and Convenience and provide an update as to how plaintiff believes his case should proceed to disposition. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 8/26/2021. (Sellers, N.)
January 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER STAYING CASE. The stay will expire on March 1, 2019, subject to further order of the Court. A status hearing will be conducted prior to the expiration of the stay and will be set by separate notice. Signed by Chief US Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 1/25/2019. (Stouch, L.)
March 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting 5 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 9 Motion for Preliminary Injunction; and denying as moot 14 Motion for Expedited Hearing. Signed by US District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 3/16/2018. Counsel is reminded to read the order in its entirety for important information. Copy emailed to Clerk's Office Financial Department. (Stouch, L.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 0.13 Acre, More or Less, in Cumberland County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0474-88-1723 Identified in Book 9573, Page 684, Instrument No. 00505, and Owned by Soon J. Chun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: R. Jonathan Charleston
Represented By: Jose A. Coker
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 0.13 Acre, More or Less, in Cumberland County, North Carolina, Located on Parcel Identification No. 0474-88-1723 Identified in Book 9573, Page 684, Instrument No. 00505, and Owned by Soon J. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soon J. Chun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?