Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375 et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375 and Evelyn Francine Stephenson
Case Number: 5:2018cv00362
Filed: July 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: JOHNSTON
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 30, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375, Evelyn Francine Stephenson (Lollar, Charles)
August 30, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles M. Lollar on behalf of 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375, Evelyn Francine Stephenson. (Lollar, Charles)
August 29, 2018 Filing 5 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375, Evelyn Francine Stephenson. (Lollar, Charles)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Dhamian A. Blue on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Blue, Dhamian)
July 23, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future documents shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-362-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 7/23/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
July 23, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
July 20, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
July 20, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4589087.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 Depiction of Property, #3 Exhibit 2 FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 Plat of Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing In Lieu of Summons) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Dhamian A. Blue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.374 Acres, More/Less, in Johnston County, NC, on PIN 08-J-15-010, Described as Tract No. 1 Containing 15.1 Acres, More/Less, and Tract No. 2 Containing 4.2 Acres, More/Less, in D.B. 708, P. 375
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evelyn Francine Stephenson
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?