Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Lula Bee Brantley, Gilbert Graham Brantley and 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County
Case Number: 5:2018cv00386
Filed: August 3, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: NASH
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2018 Filing 9 Financial Disclosure Statement by 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County, Lula Bee Brantley, Gilbert Graham Brantley (Lollar, Charles)
September 20, 2018 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles M. Lollar on behalf of All Defendants. (Lollar, Charles)
September 11, 2018 Filing 7 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County, Lula Bee Brantley, Gilbert Graham Brantley. (Lollar, Charles)
September 6, 2018 Filing 6 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for Gilbert G. Brantley, Lula Bee Brantley, and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
August 7, 2018 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance filed by Sherrod Banks on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Banks, Sherrod)
August 7, 2018 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Danielle Barbour Wilson on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Wilson, Danielle)
August 6, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-386-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/6/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
August 6, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 3, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 3, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 3, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County, Lula Bee Brantley, Gilbert Graham Brantley ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4606685.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depiction of Brantley Property, #3 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Brantley Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Represented By: Danielle Barbour Wilson
Represented By: Sherrod Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lula Bee Brantley
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Graham Brantley
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3.269 Acres, More or Less, in Nash County, NC, located on Parcel Identification Number 023877, and Identified in Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 2602, Page 490 of Public Registry of said County
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?