United States of America v. Peak Hospitality Group, LLC et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Peak Hospitality Group, LLC and Steven M Adams
Case Number: 5:2018cv00400
Filed: August 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Office: Western Division Office
County: WAKE
Presiding Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF PERMANENT INJUNCTION as to Steven M. Adams regarding #8 Joint Motion to Approve Consent Judgment - Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/12/2018. (Tripp, S.)
October 12, 2018 Motion Submitted to District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan regarding #8 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment . (Tripp, S.)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Approve Consent Judgment filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Miller, Matthew)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order TEXT ORDER - Upon receipt and consideration of plaintiff's suggestion of bankruptcy #6 , this action is hereby STAYED with respect to Defendant Peak Hospitality Group, LLC during the pendency of its bankruptcy case or until such time as the bankruptcy court shall order otherwise. Counsel for plaintiff is DIRECTED to notify the court immediately upon conclusion of the bankruptcy proceedings by filing with this court a notice stating the disposition of the bankruptcy case and including the final order in the bankruptcy matters or any other disposing order issued by the bankruptcy court. Signed by District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan on 10/5/2018. (Collins, S.)
September 21, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Steven M. Adams filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Matthew Miller, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Miller, Matthew)
September 21, 2018 Filing 6 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Peak Hospitality Group, LLC by United States of America (Miller, Matthew)
September 10, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Steven M Adams served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/15/2018. (Miller, Matthew)
September 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Peak Hospitality Group, LLC served on 8/25/2018, answer due 9/15/2018. (Miller, Matthew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Matthew B Miller on behalf of United States of America. (Miller, Matthew)
August 17, 2018 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Steven M Adams, Peak Hospitality Group, LLC. *NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summonses and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P.4.* (Collins, S.)
August 17, 2018 Notice to Counsel. Counsel should file a notice of appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Collins, S.)
August 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Steven M Adams, Peak Hospitality Group, LLC, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons for Peak Hospitality Group, LLC, #3 Proposed Summons for Steven M. Adams) (Miller, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Peak Hospitality Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peak Hospitality Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven M Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Matthew B Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?