Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.206 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, PIN 15-M-13-199-G, More Particularly Described As First Track Recorded in DB 4558, P. 704, Instr. No. 2015444533 of the Public Registry Of Said County et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Teresa C. Arthur, Richard E. Arthur and 2.206 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, PIN 15-M-13-199-G, More Particularly Described As First Track Recorded in DB 4558, P. 704, Instr. No. 2015444533 of the Public Registry Of Said County
Case Number: 5:2018cv00413
Filed: August 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: Louise Wood Flanagan
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 7 Financial Disclosure Statement by 2.206 Acres, /-, in Johnston County, NC, PIN 15-M-13-199-G, More Particularly Described As First Track Recorded in DB 4558, P. 704, Instr. No. 2015444533 of the Public Registry Of Said County, Richard E. Arthur, Teresa C. Arthur (Lollar, Charles)
October 16, 2018 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance filed by Charles M. Lollar on behalf of All Defendants. (Lollar, Charles)
October 15, 2018 Filing 5 DEFENDANTS' ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by 2.206 Acres, /-, in Johnston County, NC, PIN 15-M-13-199-G, More Particularly Described As First Track Recorded in DB 4558, P. 704, Instr. No. 2015444533 of the Public Registry Of Said County, Richard E. Arthur, Teresa C. Arthur. (Lollar, Charles)
September 25, 2018 Filing 4 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for Richard E. Arthur, Teresa C. Arthur, and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
August 23, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. United States District Judge Louise Wood Flanagan is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-413-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 8/23/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
August 23, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 23, 2018 Notice to Counsel - Counsel is reminded that the court prefers flattened pdf fillable forms. Counsel should "flatten" the civil cover sheet prior to attaching it in accordance with Section IV.B of the CM/ECF Policies and Procedures Manual. No action required at this time. (Rudd, D.)
August 22, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 22, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 22, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4630391.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1- Depiction of Arthur Property, #3 Exhibit 2- FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3- Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Athur Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry) (Attachment 6 flattened and replaced on 8/28/2018) (Edwards, S.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.206 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, PIN 15-M-13-199-G, More Particularly Described As First Track Recorded in DB 4558, P. 704, Instr. No. 2015444533 of the Public Registry Of Said County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa C. Arthur
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard E. Arthur
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.206 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, PIN 15-M-13-199-G, More Particularly Described As First Track Recorded in DB 4558, P. 704, Instr. No. 2015444533 of the Public Registry Of Said County
Represented By: Charles M. Lollar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?