Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 1.687 Acres, +/-, in Wilson County, NC, Located on PIN 2760-79-6583.000, Identified As 41.1 Acres, +/- Located in Tract 1 and 12.7 Acres Located in Tract 2 in Book 1634, P. 548 of Public Registry of S et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Robert Bissette, Celena Bunn Bissette and 1.687 Acres, +/-, in Wilson County, NC, Located on PIN 2760-79-6583.000, Identified As 41.1 Acres, +/- Located in Tract 1 and 12.7 Acres Located in Tract 2 in Book 1634, P. 548 of Public Registry of S
Case Number: 5:2018cv00426
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Referring Judge: James C Dever
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding proof of service. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Acceptance of Service for Celena Bunn Bissette, Robert Bissette, and the real property owned thereby described in the Complaint) (Kitchin, Henry)
September 4, 2018 TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Terrence W. Boyle for all further proceedings. Chief United States District Judge James C. Dever III is no longer assigned to the case. All future filings shall reflect the revised case number of 5:18-CV-426-BO. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/4/2018. (Hockaday, A.)
September 4, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4642100.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depiction of Bissette Property, #3 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Bissette Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 1.687 Acres, +/-, in Wilson County, NC, Located on PIN 2760-79-6583.000, Identified As 41.1 Acres, +/- Located in Tract 1 and 12.7 Acres Located in Tract 2 in Book 1634, P. 548 of Public Registry of S et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Bissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celena Bunn Bissette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 1.687 Acres, +/-, in Wilson County, NC, Located on PIN 2760-79-6583.000, Identified As 41.1 Acres, +/- Located in Tract 1 and 12.7 Acres Located in Tract 2 in Book 1634, P. 548 of Public Registry of S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?