Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.71 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, Located on PIN 03-P-05-010-C, Described in a NC General Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 1614, P. 481 of the Public Registry of Said County et al
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Defendant: Geoffrey A. Gordon and 2.71 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, Located on PIN 03-P-05-010-C, Described in a NC General Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 1614, P. 481 of the Public Registry of Said County
Case Number: 5:2018cv00427
Filed: August 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of North Carolina
Presiding Judge: Terrence W Boyle
Nature of Suit: Condemnation
Cause of Action: 15:717
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 5 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding Certificate of Proof of Service by Publication on Geoffrey A. Gordon. (Attachments: #1 A - Affidavit of Publication) (Kitchin, Henry)
September 17, 2018 Filing 4 Notice filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC regarding Certificate of Service by Publication. (Kitchin, Henry)
September 4, 2018 Notice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.)
August 31, 2018 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance filed by Henry L. Kitchin, Jr on behalf of Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 31, 2018 Filing 2 Financial Disclosure Statement by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Dominion Energy, Inc., Corporate Parent Duke Energy Corp., Corporate Parent Southern Company for Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Kitchin, Henry)
August 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4642103.), filed by Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits to Complaint, #2 Exhibit 1 - Depiction of Gordon Property, #3 Exhibit 2 - FERC Certificate, #4 Exhibit 3 - Map Depicting Route of ACP Project, #5 Exhibit 4 - Plat of Gordon Easements, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Notice of Filing of Complaint in Condemnation, #8 Notice Regarding Use of Notice of Filing) (Kitchin, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC v. 2.71 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, Located on PIN 03-P-05-010-C, Described in a NC General Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 1614, P. 481 of the Public Registry of Said County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Atlantic Coast Pipeline, LLC
Represented By: Henry L. Kitchin, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey A. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2.71 Acres, +/-, in Johnston County, NC, Located on PIN 03-P-05-010-C, Described in a NC General Warranty Deed Recorded in Book 1614, P. 481 of the Public Registry of Said County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?